Idaho Wool Growers Association et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: |
Idaho Wool Growers Association, American Sheep Industry Association, Public Lands Council, Wyoming Wool Growers Association, Carlson Company, Inc., Shirts Brothers Sheep and Colorado Wool Growers Association |
Defendant: |
Tom Vilsack, Tom Tidwell, Keith Lannom and United States Forest Service |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00469 |
Filed: |
September 13, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Boise - Southern Office |
County: |
Ada - Southern |
Presiding Judge: |
Ronald E Bush |
Nature of Suit: |
Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 4321 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND LITIGATION PLAN SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF LAPSE IN APPROPRIATIONS re {43] Stipulation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
October 1, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stay of Briefing Schedule 41 is GRANTED, an d all time limits and deadlines in this case with the one exception listed below -- are extended for a period of time equal to the duration of the lapse in appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 26 Motion. The Court shall allow the plaintiffs to submit declarations from Drs. Donald P. Knowles, Margaret A. Highland, and Mark C. Thurmond. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Western Watersheds Project, Hells Canyon Preservation Council, The Wilderness Society. The Wilderness Society, Western Watersheds Project, and Hells Canyon Prese rvation Council are granted the right to intervene pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2). With regard to the pending motion to expand the administrative record (doc 26), the intervenors may file a response brief, limited to 3 pages, on or before 2/27/13. The pla intiffs may file a reply brief, limited to 2 pages, to the intervenors' brief on or before 3/6/13. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER ( Motions due by 1/18/2013.) The Government shall file any response also -limited to 8 pages- on or before January 28, 2013; Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief - limited to 3 pages on or before February 4, 2013.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?