September 25, 2017 |
Filing
360
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 344 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
358
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees 332 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Heinz shall pay Bright Harvest attorney fees in the amount of $781,025.00 and costs in the amount of $5,535.85. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
342
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b) and/or to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) (Dkt. 326 ) is DENIED. Plaint iff's Second Rule 59 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and for NewTrial (Dkt. 327 ) is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule 59(a) Dkt. 328 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
272
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER The motion in limine (Dkts. 206 ) is DENIED. The motions in limine (Dkts. 211 and 212 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
265
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The motions in limine (Dkts. 209 , 210 , 213 , 214 and 215 ) are GRANTED. 2. The motions in limine (Dkts. 203 , 204 , 205 , 207 , and 208 ) are DENIED. 3. The Court will reserve ruli ng on motions in limine (Dkts. 206 , 211 and 212 ) until it receives the briefs on judicial estoppel and the long-term option contract issue. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
September 25, 2015 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Memorandum Decision and Order (Dkt. 192 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
179
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Bright Harvest's Motion (Dkt. 165 ) to Alter the Judgment is DENIED, but Bright Harvest's Motion for New Trial is GRANTED. The motions related to attorney fees (Dkts. 155 , 171 and 172 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motions may be re-filed depending upon the outcome of the new trial. The Court will enter a separate notice of hearing for the purpose of choosing a date for the new trial. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine (Dkt. 85 ) is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part. Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine (Dkt. 86 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Fifth Motion in Limine (Dkt. 110 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing
120
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Third Motion in Limine (Dkt. 87 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's First Motion in Limine (Dkt. 69 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Fourth Motion in Limine (Dkt. 88 ) is GRANTED . Defendant's Second Motion in Limine (Dkt. 70 ) is DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
112
ORDER Defendant shall file a response to the Motion in Limine (Dkt. 110 ) on or before 3/6/15, and Plaintiff shall file a reply brief on or before 3/9/15. Defendant may file a sur-reply to Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine (Dkt. 85 ) on or bef ore 3/6/15. On or before 3/13/15, Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with a list of the order Plaintiff intends to call its witnesses.Approximately 2 days before Defendant intends to begin its case-in-chief, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with a list of the order Defendant intends to call its witnesses.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 45 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 47 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 51 ) is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
58
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 42 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
36
PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS granting 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Agreed Protective Order Re: Disclosure of Confidential Documents]. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
33
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ( ADR Plan to be filed by 11/15/2013., Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2013., Discovery due by 4/15/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2013., Motions due by 5/15/2014.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
|