Saetrum v. Ada County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: |
Adam Todd Saetrum |
Defendant: |
Ada County Sheriff's Office, Gary Raney, Jake Vogt and John and Jane Does |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00425 |
Filed: |
September 27, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Boise - Southern Office |
County: |
Ada - Southern |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Lynn Winmill |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 11, 2017 |
Filing
245
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for New Trial (Docket No. 236 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
66
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS; MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MOTION TO STRIKE; and MOTION RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying in part and granting in part 44 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 45 Defendant's Motion to Strike; denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for a Ruling Regarding Service and Personal Jurisdiction. The stay of discovery imposed in the 5/22/2014 Order is L IFTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a Third Amended Complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
May 22, 2014 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Stay Discovery and Motion to Disqualify. Defendants' motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint in its entirety be (Docket No. [20 is GRANTED; defendants' motion to stay discovery (Do cket No. 29 ) is GRANTED and all discovery is stayed until the court rules on any motion to dismiss any Second Amended Complaint; and Deputy Vogt's motion to disqualify Rodney Saetrum as counsel for plaintiff (Docket No. 18 )is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has 20 days from the date this Order is signed to file a Second Amended Complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order.. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (jp)
|
January 14, 2014 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Motion for a More Definite Statement. The motion for a more definite statement (Docket No. 4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?