Lonn v. Corizon Health et al
Plaintiff: David K Lonn
Defendant: Corizon Health, April Dawson, David W Agler and Klint H Stander
Case Number: 1:2014cv00031
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W. Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Report and Recommendation entered on May 19, 2017 (Dkt. 88 ) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 78 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff&# 039;s claims against Defendant Dr. Agler are DISMISED. The Claims against Corizon Health Services are DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE THE CASE as all claims against all Defendants have now been dismissed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 75 ) is DENIED, with the exception that Defendant must supplement his answer to Interrogatory 13. 2) Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Pretrial Schedule (Dkt. 76 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Motions terminated: 75 MOTION to Compel filed by David K Lon and, 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David K Lonn. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation entered on May 24, 2016 (Dkt. 72 ) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 55 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs claims against Dr. Dawson and Dr. Stander are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; incorporating and adopting 62 Report and Recommendation; denying 47 Dr Agler's Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the proposed Amended Complaint (Dkt. 32 -1) as an operative pleading under its own docket number. Dr. Agler shall be granted 30 days to file a response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Report and Recommendation entered on 6/26/15 (Dkt. 44 ) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY as follows: 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Pleadings (Dkt. 32 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his second a mended complaint, in accordance with the direction as stated in the Report, on or before 10/2/15. 2) Dr. Klint Stander's Motion for Partial Dismissal and/or Summary Judgment (Dkt. 30 ) is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED as stated in the Report. 3) Dr. April Dawson's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 14 ) is DENIED as stated in the Report. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lonn v. Corizon Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K Lonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Agler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klint H Stander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?