Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Otter et al

Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund, People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, American Civil Liberties Union of Idaho, The Center for Food Safety, Farm Sanctuary, River's Wish Animal Sanctuary, Western Watersheds Project, Sandpoint Vegetarians, Idaho Concerned Area Residents for the Environment, Idaho Hispanic Caucus Institute for Research and Education, Counterpunch, Farm Forward, Will Potter, James McWilliams, Monte Hickman, Blair Koch and Daniel Hauff
Defendant: C.L. Butch Otter and Lawrence Wasden
Case Number: 1:2014cv00104
Filed: March 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Declaratory Judgment (Dkt. 140 ) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs unopposed Request for Judicial Notice (Dkt. 142 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dkt. 117 ), as corrected (Dkt. 118 -1), is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiffs are awarded $249,875.08 in fees, expenses, and costs. The motion is DENIED to the extent Plaintiffs request any additional amounts. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 74 ALDF's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM DECISION Idaho Dairymen's Association's Motion to Reconsider the Order Denying Intervention 61 is Denied. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 12 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Governor Otter will be dismissed as a defendant. Additionally, all claims under section 18-7042(1)(e) will be dismissed. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 16 IDA's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Otter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew G Liebman
Represented By: Justin F Marceau
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Idaho
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Sanctuary
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River's Wish Animal Sanctuary
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandpoint Vegetarians
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Concerned Area Residents for the Environment
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Hispanic Caucus Institute for Research and Education
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counterpunch
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Forward
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Potter
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McWilliams
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Hickman
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Koch
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hauff
Represented By: Maria E Andrade
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. Butch Otter
Represented By: Thomas C. Perry
Represented By: Cally Ann Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Wasden
Represented By: Clay R Smith
Represented By: Carl J Withroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?