Harrison v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ryan A. Harrison and C1 Design Group LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00146
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. The Judgment entered on February 17, 2017, will be amended to reflect an award of attorney's fees in the amount of $33,735.00. Plaintiff must file its Bill of Costs within fourteen (14) days, to be taxed by the Clerk consistent with the Court's directions. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 62 Motion to Include Evidence of "Cash on Hand". Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM REQUIREMENT THAT PERSON WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ATTEND MEDIATION (DKT. 37) granting 37 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan A. Harrison
Represented By: Sarah Belle Bratton
Represented By: Martin J Martelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C1 Design Group LLC
Represented By: Sarah Belle Bratton
Represented By: Martin J Martelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?