Western Watersheds Project et al v. Schneider et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Center for Biological Diversity and Prairie Hills Audubon Society
Defendant: Janice Schneider, Bureau of Land Management and US Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2016cv00083
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion for preliminary injunction (docket no. 124 ) is GRANTED. The BLM is enjoined from implementing the 2019 BLM Sage-Grouse Plan Amendments for Idaho, Wyoming, Colorado, Utah, Nevada/ Northeastern California, and Oregon, until such time as the Court can adjudicate the claims on the merits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the plaintiffs motion to supplement with the declaration of Dr. Braun (docket no. 182 ) and intervenors motion to supplement with the declaration of Uriarte (docket no. 183 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to dismiss or, in the alternative to sever and transfer (docket no. 164 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to sever and transfer (docket no. 144 ) and the motion to sever and transfer (docket no. 147 )are DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The motion to file supplemental complaint (docket no. 118 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 46 Motion to Sever and Transfer; granting 61 Motion to file Amicus Brief; denying 70 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD re 82 . Defendants shall file the Administrative Record on or before 3/17/2017 (Case Management deadline set for 3/17/2017). Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of any objections to the Administrative Record on or before 5/17/2017. If Plaintiffs objections to the Administrative Record are not resolved, Plaintiffs shall file any motion challenging the Administrative Record on or before 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2016. Motions to Change Venue and Intervention Motions due by 6/30/2016. Defendant's Administrative Record due by 1/31/2017 (Case Management deadline set for 1/31/2017). If Plaintiffs have any unresolved objections, any motion challenging the Administrative Record is due by 5/1/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project et al v. Schneider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Todd C Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Todd C Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Todd C Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prairie Hills Audubon Society
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Todd C Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Schneider
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: Luther L Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: Luther L Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Forest Service
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: Luther L Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?