Lewis et al v. Beck Ranch, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lewis, Tim King and Layne Lewis
Defendant: Beck Ranch, Inc, John Does 1-10, Black Canyon Irrigation District, Beck Ranch, Inc. and ABC Companies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00312
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 The Clerk's Office closed this civil matter pursuant to the #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cjs)
July 19, 2016 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #3 Notice (Other) filed by Layne Lewis, Tim King was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The correct event is "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal" located under Notices. The filing party DOES NOT need to re-submit their filing.(cjs)
July 18, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE by Tim King, Layne Lewis of Dismissal (Cummings, Richard)
July 13, 2016 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
July 13, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Beck Ranch, Inc., John Does 1-10, Tim King, Layne Lewis re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/15/2016. (cjs)
July 13, 2016 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Beck Ranch, Inc. served on 7/12/2016; John Does 1-10 served on 7/12/2016. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
July 12, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Does 1-10 United States of America from In the District Court of the Third Judicial District of the State of Idaho, in and for the County of Canyon, case number CV-2016-5789., filed by John Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit A - Notice of Appearance (Beck Ranch), #6 Exhibit A - Affdavit of Service, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Woychick, Nicholas) Modified on 7/13/2016 to edit filing party in text (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Beck Ranch, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim King
Represented By: Richard A Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layne Lewis
Represented By: Richard A Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beck Ranch, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Canyon Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beck Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: David E Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?