Hayes v. Nettles et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael T Hayes |
Defendant: |
Rachel Nettles, Michael Montgomery and Charles Johannessen |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00534 |
Filed: |
December 13, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Boise - Southern Office |
County: |
Ada - Southern |
Presiding Judge: |
Candy W. Dale |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 27, 2020 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 85 ) is GRANTED. Hayess two remaining claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with Federal Rule ofCivil Procedure 58. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
|
October 5, 2020 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Hayess Motion to Compel (Dkt. 82 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
|
January 7, 2020 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Defendants Motion to Amend Admissions by Default (Dkt. 80 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
|
October 29, 2019 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Third Affirmative Defense (Dkt. 76 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
|
October 11, 2017 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Stay (Dkt. 13 ) is MOOT. 2. Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Additional Screening Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915, 1915A (Dkt. 17 ) is DEN IED without prejudice. 3. Plaintiffs Motions for Sanctions (Dkt. 27 and 31 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?