Allred v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randi Allred
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 1:2017cv00483
Filed: November 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1) Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Enforcement of the Order Granting Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Dkt. 157 ) is DENIED.2) The Courts previous deadline for the payment of fees and costs, September 6, 2019, is vacat ed. 3) Fees and costs previously awarded to Defendants in the amount of $3,842.47 must be remitted by Plaintiffs attorney to counsel for Defendants on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that Allred's October 26, 2018 Rule 30(b)(6) is quashed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Dkt. 41 ) is GRANTED.Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to immediately file a non-redline version of docket entry 41 Exhibit A as a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - the Court hereby ORDERS: 1. Defendants Motion for Entry of Protective Order Precluding the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Home Depot (Dkt. 29 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Continued Deposition of Josh Hazlett, to Extend the Deadline for Discovery, and for Sanctions (Dkt. 31 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; 3. Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Compel the Continued Deposition of Josh Hazlett, to Extend the Deadline for Discovery, and for Sanctions (Dkt. 32 ) is GRANTED IN PART with res pect to its request for sanctions. Defendants Counsel, Fortis Law Partners LLC, is to pay Plaintiffs Counsel, Pickens Cozakos, PA, Two Thousand and Seventy-Eight Dollars ($2078.00) pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 37(d)(3) and 37(b)( 2)(A)(i-vii); 4. The Parties Joint Motion for Modification of Case Management Order to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline (Dkt. 50 ) is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court will vacate the dispositive motion deadline of 9/28/2018 . However, the Court will review and decide the merits of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Dkt. 41 ) before setting a new dispositive motion deadline. Within one week of the Courts entry of its decision on Plaintiffs Renew ed Motion, the Parties are to propose a new dispositive motion deadline keeping in mind the Courts admonition that this case be speedily moved towards trial or settlement; 5. The Court may, depending on its decision regarding Plaintiffs Renewed Motio n for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Dkt. 41 ), further extend the discovery deadline. If the Court decides the Motion in Plaintiffs favor, the Parties are to propose a new discovery deadline within one week of the Courts entry of decision. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allred v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Allred
Represented By: Shelly Cozakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Julianne Slayton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?