S. Crow Collateral Corp. v. United States of America
Petitioner: S. Crow Collateral Corp.
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2017mc09828
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by S. Crow Collateral Corp. for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Judge Ronald E. Bush, re #28 USCA Case Number, #27 Notice of Appeal, #29 USCA Scheduling Order (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) Transcript due by 8/6/2018. (Woodard, Wade)
June 7, 2018 Filing 29 USCA TIME SCHEDULE Order as to #27 Notice of Appeal, filed by S. Crow Collateral Corp.. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (jp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 28 USCA Case Number 18-35492 for #27 Notice of Appeal, filed by S. Crow Collateral Corp. (jp)
June 6, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order Dismissing Case, by S. Crow Collateral Corp.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0976-1746444. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Woodard, Wade) (18-35492)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation entered on January 19, 2018 #20 is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY and the Court HEREBY ORDERS the Petition #1 is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss and Enforce the Summons #11 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 15, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO R&R filed by United States of America.(Loebner, Natalie)
February 2, 2018 NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Patrick C. Bageant wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Bageant, Patrick)
February 2, 2018 Filing 24 OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendations . (Woodard, Wade)
February 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by S. Crow Collateral Corp. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Woodard, Wade)
January 30, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (st)
January 28, 2018 Filing 21 Transcript of Proceedings for Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2017 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Court Reporter/Transcriber NW Transcripts, LLC, Telephone number 206-953-7066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed.. Redaction Request due 2/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018. (st)
January 19, 2018 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that: Petitioners' Petition to Quash IRS Summons to Pioneer Title #1 be DENIED. Respondent's Motion to Summarily Dismiss Petition and Enforce the Summons #11 be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 17, 2018 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (st)
December 13, 2017 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2017 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Quash IRS Summons filed by United States of America.DOC. 1 and 11 UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter/ESR lcase.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: 12/13/2017 MOTION HEARING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's request for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED at this time. However, Petitioner will be permitted to argue at the motion hearing in favor of holding an evidentiary hearing. Depending on the persuasiveness of any such argument, the Court may continue the motion hearing until an evidentiary hearing is held. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 17, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for S. Crow Collateral Corp. and United States of America re #16 Notice of Appearance and #1 MOTION to Quash. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/16/2018. (st)
November 15, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Morris Shoemaker on behalf of United States of America (Shoemaker, Martin)
November 14, 2017 Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [DOC. 11] MOTION for Summary Judgment Hearing; although captioned as a motion to dismiss, it must be treated as a motion for Summary Judgment because Respondent presented matters outside the pleading. FRCP 12 (d). Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2017 09:30 AM (MTN. TIME)in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. (lc)
November 14, 2017 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Quash IRS Summons filed by United States of America.(Loebner, Natalie)
October 31, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Quash IRS Summons filed by S. Crow Collateral Corp.. Replies due by 11/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(Woodard, Wade)
October 18, 2017 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kathleen M Pakenham for S. Crow Collateral Corp.; approving #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephen D Gardner for S. Crow Collateral Corp.; approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Clint E Massengill for S. Crow Collateral Corp. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 10, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Quash IRS Summons Natalie Marie Loebner appearing for Respondent United States of America. Responses due by 10/31/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Decl Revenue Agent Lopez, #3 Exhibit Ex A- Summons Issued to Pioneer, #4 Exhibit Ex b - Attested Copy Issued to Pioneer, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Notice to Crow and SCCC)(Loebner, Natalie)
October 5, 2017 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. Crow Collateral Corp. re #9 Notice (Other) Corrected (Woodard, Wade)
October 5, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE by S. Crow Collateral Corp. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Woodard, Wade)
October 5, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Clint E. Massengill. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1644901.)Wade L. Woodard appearing for Petitioner S. Crow Collateral Corp..Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 10/26/2017 (Woodard, Wade)
October 5, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Gardner. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1644894.)Wade L. Woodard appearing for Petitioner S. Crow Collateral Corp..Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 10/26/2017 (Woodard, Wade)
October 5, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Pakenham. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1644889.)Wade L. Woodard appearing for Petitioner S. Crow Collateral Corp..Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 10/26/2017 (Woodard, Wade)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by S. Crow Collateral Corp.. (Woodard, Wade)
August 22, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Crow Collateral Corp.. (Woodard, Wade)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
August 8, 2017 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 47.00, receipt # IDX100020538 (st)
August 8, 2017 Filing 1 S. Crow Collateral Corp.'s Petition to Quash Internal Revenue Service Summons Issued to Pioneer Title.Wade L. Woodard and Daniel Richard Charles Mortensen appearing for Petitioner S. Crow Collateral Corp. Responses due by 8/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Stanley D. Crow in Support of Memorandum of Law, #3 Declaration of Yoram Keinan in Support of S. Crow Collateral Corporation's Petition, #4 civil cover sheet)(st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. Crow Collateral Corp. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: S. Crow Collateral Corp.
Represented By: Wade L. Woodard
Represented By: Daniel Richard Charles Mortensen
Represented By: Patrick Casey Bageant
Represented By: Kathleen M Pakenham
Represented By: Stephen D Gardner
Represented By: Clint E Massengill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Natalie Marie Loebner
Represented By: Martin Morris Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?