Zeyen et al v. Boise District #1 et al
Plaintiff: Olivia Zeyen, Mike Zeyen, Rachael Booth, Kim Wood and Troy District #287
Defendant: Richfield District #316, Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281, Boise District #1, Grace Joint District #148, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486, Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452, Caldwell District #132, Mullan District #392, Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596, Cambridge #432, ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331, Middleton District #134, Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Fremont County Joint District #215, Cascade District #422, Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131, Garden Valley District #71, Preston Joint District #201, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc., Minidoka County Joint District #331, Swan Valley District #92, Parma District #137;, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Salmon District #291, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Castleford District #417, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466, Legacy Charter School LEA #478, Wendell District #232, McCall- Donnelly District #421, Filer District #413, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, Marsing District #363, Clark County District #161, Cassia Joint District #151, Bliss District #234, Heritage Academy LEA #479, West Ada School District #2, Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477, Vision Charter School LEA #463, Moscow District #281, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Twin Falls District #411, Wallace District #393, Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490, Snake River District #52, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Avery District #394, Midvale District #433, Post Falls District #273, Meadows Valley District #11, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Homedale Joint District #370, Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487, Alturas International Academy LEA #495, Gooding Joint District #231, Teton County District #401, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Soda Springs Joint District #150, West Bonner County District #83, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Rockland District #382, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Ririe Joint District #252, Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc., Weiser District #431, Mackay District #182, Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131, Xavier Charter School LEA #462, North Gem District #149, Whitepine Joint District #288, Jerome Joint District #261, Culdesac Joint District #342, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Boundary County District #101, Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457, Buhl Joint District #412, Council District #13, Lakeland Joint District #272, Kootenai District #274, Salmon River Joint District #243, Lewiston Independent District #340, Meridian Technical Charter High School, Mountain Home District #193, Hagerman District #233, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Mountain View District #244, Basin District #72, South Lemhi School District #292, Blackfoot District #55, Kamiah Joint District #304, Idaho Falls District #91, Highland District #305, American Falls Joint District #381, Lapwai District #341, Emmett Independent District #221, Kuna Joint District #3, Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485, Kimberly District #414, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, St. Maries Joint District #41, Pleasant Valley District #364, Bear Lake County District #33, Arbon Elementary District #383, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Shoshone Joint District #312, Potlatch District #285, Kendrick District #283, Notus District #135, Valley District #262, SugarSalem District #322, Prairie Elementary District #191, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Melba Joint District #136, Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489, North Star Charter School LEA #493, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Genesee Joint District #282, Shelley Joint District #60, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483, Bonneville Joint District #93, West Side District #202, Glenns Ferry District #192, Dietrich District #314, Nampa District #131, Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469, Connections Academy #457, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Orofino Joint District #171, Payette Joint District #371, Butte County District #111, Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481, Kellogg Joint District #391, Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490, Fruitland District #373, Blaine County District #61, Hansen District #415, Aberdeen District #58, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221, North Valley Academy LEA #465, Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456, Challis Joint District #181, Madison District #321, American Heritage Charter School LEA #482, Camas County District #121, Nezperce District #302, New Plymouth School District #372, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Firth District #59, Oneida County District #351, Vallivue District #139, Murtaugh District #418, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, West Jefferson District #253 and Wilder District #133
Case Number: 1:2018cv00207
Filed: May 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #118 Amended Complaint Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, Jason)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Bifurcate (Dkt. #121 ) is DENIED without prejudice to revisiting the issue upon Plaintiffs motion following a decision regarding class certification. AJH Defendants Motion to Determine the Applicable Statue of Limitations and for Protective Order (Dkt. #124 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B Lynn Winmill: Video Motion Hearing was held on 11/18/2021 re #121 MOTION to Bifurcate and #124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 (Dr. Joki Report), #4 Exhibit 1 Part 1 to Dr. Joki Report, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 2 to Dr. Joki Report, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 3 to Dr. Joki Report, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 4 to Dr. Joki Report, #8 Exhibit 1 Part 5 to Dr. Joki Report, #9 Exhibit 2 (Dr. Ranells Report))(Wood, Jason)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #121 MOTION to Bifurcate and #124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations: A Video Motion Hearing is set for 11/18/2021 at 4:00 PM (Mountain Time) via Zoom before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Counsel will receive a video link by a separate notification. Members of the public may use the following to attend this matter via Audio ONLY: 1-669-254-5252,Meeting ID: 160 199 8160, Meeting Passcode: 587022. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition under federal law and Local Rule 83.1 against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings.(jlg)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations, and #121 MOTION to Bifurcate : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 04:00 PM in Video - Boise to Other location (Mountain Time) before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Zoom link information will be provided prior to the date of the hearing. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (slm)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Amend/Correct #118 Amended Complaint Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, Jason)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #121 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2021.(Wood, T)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations AJH Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations and For Protection Order (Dkt. 124) filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2021.(Walther, Bret)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ANSWER to #118 Amended Complaint Corrected Second by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139.(Gardner, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE by Boise District #1 re #121 MOTION to Bifurcate of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Separate Trials/Bifurcation (Julian, Brian)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #121 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139. Replies due by 8/30/2021.(Gardner, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 8/25/2021.(Wood, T)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Protective Order and to Determine Applicable Statute of Limitations Bret Allen Walther appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 8/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Walther, Bret)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SCHEDULING ORDER / CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2021. Discovery due by 1/11/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AJH Defendants' ANSWER to #118 Amended Complaint by Boise District #1.(Julian, Brian)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Bifurcate T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DISCOVERY PLAN by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen re #119 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Wood, T)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. (Wood, T)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED SECOND against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wood, T)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Plaintiff has filed the second amended complaint, as an "amended document," see Dkt. #113 and has filed a corrected second amended complaint as an attachment to an errata, see Dkt #116 . This is improper. An amended complaint is to be filed under the event "amended complaint." Plaintiff is directed to refile the second amended complaint, as corrected, under the event "amended complaint." Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (slm)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ERRATA by Plaintiffs Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Second Amended Complaint)(Wood, T)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DISCOVERY PLAN by Boise District #1 re #114 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Walther, Bret)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Boise District #1. (Walther, Bret)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Amendment to #21 Amended Complaint . (Wood, T)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - AJH Defendants Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #91 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs amended motion to amend/correct (Dkt. #94 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs renewed motion for class certification (Dkt. #97 ) is DENIED without prejudice. AJH Defendants motion to stay or extend time (Dkt. #98 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs motion to strike (Dkt. #110 ) is DENIED as moot. A telephonic scheduling conference is set for August 2, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall file, no later than July 26, 2021, their proposed jointplans. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #110 MOTION to Strike #109 Reply to Response to Motion, AJH Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Reconsider MDO (Dkt. 110) filed by Boise District #1. Replies due by 5/24/2021.(Walther, Bret)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Strike #109 Reply to Response to Motion, T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #81 Memorandum Decision,, Terminate Motions, filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walther, Bret)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint, #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs , Reply to AJH Defendants, filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/27/2021.(Wood, T)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint, #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/27/2021.(Wood, T)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 MOTION to Stay re #97 Second MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #97 Second MOTION to Certify Class filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/27/2021.(Walther, Bret)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint, #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Vallivue District #139. Replies due by 5/3/2021.(Gardner, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint, #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs filed by Boise District #1. Replies due by 5/3/2021.(Walther, Bret)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION to Stay re #97 Second MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 4/28/2021.(Wood, T)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #81 Memorandum Decision,, Terminate Motions, filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 4/27/2021.(Wood, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Defendants' response to the pending Second Motion to Certify Class (Dkt. 97) is STAYED until the Court resolves the Motion to Stay, filed at Dkt. 98. If the Court denies the Motion to Stay, the defendants shall file their response to the Second Motion to Certify Class within 14 days of the order denying the motion to stay. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER finding as moot #84 Motion to Amend/Correct. The motion to amend at Dkt. 84 is DEEMED MOOT in light of the amended motion filed at Dkt. 94. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Stay re #97 Second MOTION to Certify Class ( Responses due by 4/26/2021), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification Bret Allen Walther appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification)(Walther, Bret)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Second MOTION to Certify Class T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE re #93 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan, #90 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan, filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen . (Wood, T)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2021 is VACATED and RESET for 4/8/2021 at 2:30 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The parties are instructed to call the Court's conference line at 1-877-336-1828 and enter access code 4685496 at the time of the hearing.(jlg)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint, #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 4/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Boise District #1. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Walther, Bret)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by Boise District #1 in Support of Defendants' Motion to Reconsider the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order (Dkt. 81). (Walther, Bret)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #81 Memorandum Decision,, Terminate Motions, Bret Allen Walther appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Walther, Bret)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139. (Gardner, David)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2021 03:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on March 31, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall meet and confer before that date in an effort to agree on a litigation plan and discovery plan. On or before March 26, 2021, the parties shall file proposed joint plans (if they reached agreement) or, alternatively, the parties shall submit separate proposed plans, and they shall briefly explain the points of disagreement. If the parties do not submit a stipulated plan, plaintiff may choose to rest on the plans previously submitted or, alternatively, may submit new proposed plans. The Court's form litigation plan and form discovery plan may be found on the District Court's website (www.id.uscourts.gov, under Forms). The parties' litigation plan should include a timeframe for plaintiff to file the anticipated class certification motion. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE re #81 Memorandum Decision,, Terminate Motions, #87 Response(generic) filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY PLANS. (Wood, T)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE re #86 Discovery Plan, #85 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan filed by Boise District #1 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Litigation and Discovery Plans. (Walther, Bret)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DISCOVERY PLAN by Mike Zeyen . (Wood, T)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Mike Zeyen. (Wood, T)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder of Plaintiffs T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 4/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STATUS REPORT by Mike Zeyen. (Wood, T)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/17/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The parties are instructed to call the Court's conference line at 1-877-336-1828 and enter access code 4685496 at the time of the hearing. (jlg)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The defendants motions for summary judgment (docket nos. #68 & #72 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to certify class (docket no. #50 ) is DENIED. The plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (docket no. #69 ) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to strike (docket no. #66 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. ((alw)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Video Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2020 re #50 MOTION to Certify Class, #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and #72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants. Motions deemed under advisement. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #50 MOTION to Certify Class, #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and #72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants,: A Video Motion Hearing will be held by Zoom on 9/3/2020 at 4:00 PM in Video - Boise to Other location (Mountain Time) before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The Parties will be provided a link to connect to video separately. The public may listen to the hearing by phone using the following information: 1-669-254-5252; Meeting ID: 161 307 2963; Password: 745013. Members of the public are reminded to mute their phones and that recording the proceedings is prohibited. (jlb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants, filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020.(Julian, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to Motion re #72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants, filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim A. Wood)(Wood, T)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mike Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert C. Huntley)(Wood, T)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mike Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert C. Huntley)(Wood, T)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #50 MOTION to Certify Class, #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and #72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants: A Motion Hearing is set for 9/3/2020 at 2:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jlb)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139. Replies due by 8/6/2020.(Gardner, David)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AJH Defendants, Brian K Julian appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 8/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Affidavit of Bret A. Walther In Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Bret A. Walther in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Julian, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Boise District #1. Replies due by 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Julian, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Statement Undisputed Facts re: Dkt 69 re #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.(Wood, T)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 7/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support)(Wood, T)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Joinder in BJH Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Dkt. 64 Jetta Hatch Mathews appearing for Defendants McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139. Responses due by 7/22/2020 (Mathews, Jetta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2020.(Wood, T)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Strike #63 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #64 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 7/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs motion for immediate entry of order certifying class or, in the alternative, to set a hearing date (docket no. #58 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A hearing date be set on the motion to certify class (docket no. #50 ) for September 3, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise Idaho. The defendants motion for extension of time to file a response brief to the motion to certify class (docket no. #52 ) and the motions for joinder in that motion (docket nos. #53 & #55 ) are DENIED. The defendants motion for protective order (docket no. #51 ) and the motion for joinder in that motion (docket no. #54 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #50 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2020 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Brian K. Julian re #50 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Boise District #1. Replies due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Declaration of Brian K. Julian in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Julian, Brian)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION to Certify Class Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Nezperce District #302, Orofino Joint District #171, ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331, Aberdeen District #58, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, Alturas International Academy LEA #495, American Falls Joint District #381, American Heritage Charter School LEA #482, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Arbon Elementary District #383, Avery District #394, Basin District #72, Bear Lake County District #33, Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485, Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477, Blackfoot District #55, Blaine County District #61, Bliss District #234, Boise District #1, Bonneville Joint District #93, Boundary County District #101, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Buhl Joint District #412, Butte County District #111, Caldwell District #132, Camas County District #121, Cambridge #432, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Cascade District #422, Cassia Joint District #151, Castleford District #417, Challis Joint District #181, Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483, Clark County District #161, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Connections Academy #457, Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Council District #13, Culdesac Joint District #342, Dietrich District #314, Emmett Independent District #221, Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456, Filer District #413, Firth District #59, Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487, Fremont County Joint District #215, Fruitland District #373, Garden Valley District #71, Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131, Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490, Genesee Joint District #282, Glenns Ferry District #192, Gooding Joint District #231, Grace Joint District #148, Hagerman District #233, Hansen District #415, Heritage Academy LEA #479, Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481, Highland District #305, Homedale Joint District #370, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131, Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469, Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490, Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596, Idaho Falls District #91, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489, Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452, Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Jerome Joint District #261, Kamiah Joint District #304, Kellogg Joint District #391, Kendrick District #283, Kimberly District #414, Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470, Kootenai District #274, Kuna Joint District #3, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Lakeland Joint District #272, Lapwai District #341, Legacy Charter School LEA #478, Lewiston Independent District #340, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Mackay District #182, Madison District #321, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Marsing District #363, Meadows Valley District #11, Melba Joint District #136, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Meridian Technical Charter High School, Middleton District #134, Midvale District #433, Minidoka County Joint District #331, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281, Moscow District #281, Mountain Home District #193, Mountain View District #244, Mullan District #392, Murtaugh District #418, Nampa District #131, New Plymouth School District #372, North Gem District #149, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, North Star Charter School LEA #493, North Valley Academy LEA #465, Notus District #135, Oneida County District #351, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Parma District #137;, Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc., Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc., Payette Joint District #371, Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221, Pleasant Valley District #364, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Post Falls District #273, Potlatch District #285, Prairie Elementary District #191, Preston Joint District #201, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Richfield District #316, Ririe Joint District #252, Rockland District #382, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Salmon District #291, Salmon River Joint District #243, Shelley Joint District #60, Shoshone Joint District #312, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Snake River District #52, Soda Springs Joint District #150, South Lemhi School District #292, St. Maries Joint District #41, SugarSalem District #322, Swan Valley District #92, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Teton County District #401, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Troy District #287, Twin Falls District #411, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486, Valley District #262, Vallivue District #139, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Vision Charter School LEA #463, Wallace District #393, Weiser District #431, Wendell District #232, West Ada School District #2, West Bonner County District #83, West Jefferson District #253, West Side District #202, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Whitepine Joint District #288, Wilder District #133, Xavier Charter School LEA #462, iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466. Replies due by 6/19/2020.(Collaer, Phillip)
May 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, REQUEST FOR HEARING re #50 MOTION to Certify Class RE: TWIN FALLS DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/18/2020.(Wood, T)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JOINDER by Defendants McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Vallivue District #139 joining #59 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Mathews, Jetta)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, REQUEST FOR HEARING re #50 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2020.(Wood, T)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, REQUEST FOR HEARING re #50 MOTION to Certify Class filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Nezperce District #302, Orofino Joint District #171, ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331, Aberdeen District #58, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, Alturas International Academy LEA #495, American Falls Joint District #381, American Heritage Charter School LEA #482, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Arbon Elementary District #383, Avery District #394, Basin District #72, Bear Lake County District #33, Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485, Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477, Blackfoot District #55, Blaine County District #61, Bliss District #234, Boise District #1, Bonneville Joint District #93, Boundary County District #101, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Buhl Joint District #412, Butte County District #111, Caldwell District #132, Camas County District #121, Cambridge #432, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Cascade District #422, Cassia Joint District #151, Castleford District #417, Challis Joint District #181, Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483, Clark County District #161, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Connections Academy #457, Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Council District #13, Culdesac Joint District #342, Dietrich District #314, Emmett Independent District #221, Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456, Filer District #413, Firth District #59, Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487, Fremont County Joint District #215, Fruitland District #373, Garden Valley District #71, Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131, Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490, Genesee Joint District #282, Glenns Ferry District #192, Gooding Joint District #231, Grace Joint District #148, Hagerman District #233, Hansen District #415, Heritage Academy LEA #479, Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481, Highland District #305, Homedale Joint District #370, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131, Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469, Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490, Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596, Idaho Falls District #91, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489, Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452, Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Jerome Joint District #261, Kamiah Joint District #304, Kellogg Joint District #391, Kendrick District #283, Kimberly District #414, Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470, Kootenai District #274, Kuna Joint District #3, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Lakeland Joint District #272, Lapwai District #341, Legacy Charter School LEA #478, Lewiston Independent District #340, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Mackay District #182, Madison District #321, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Marsing District #363, Meadows Valley District #11, Melba Joint District #136, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Meridian Technical Charter High School, Middleton District #134, Midvale District #433, Minidoka County Joint District #331, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281, Moscow District #281, Mountain Home District #193, Mountain View District #244, Mullan District #392, Murtaugh District #418, Nampa District #131, New Plymouth School District #372, North Gem District #149, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, North Star Charter School LEA #493, North Valley Academy LEA #465, Notus District #135, Oneida County District #351, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Parma District #137;, Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc., Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc., Payette Joint District #371, Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221, Pleasant Valley District #364, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Post Falls District #273, Potlatch District #285, Prairie Elementary District #191, Preston Joint District #201, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Richfield District #316, Ririe Joint District #252, Rockland District #382, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Salmon District #291, Salmon River Joint District #243, Shelley Joint District #60, Shoshone Joint District #312, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Snake River District #52, Soda Springs Joint District #150, South Lemhi School District #292, St. Maries Joint District #41, SugarSalem District #322, Swan Valley District #92, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Teton County District #401, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Troy District #287, Twin Falls District #411, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486, Valley District #262, Vallivue District #139, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Vision Charter School LEA #463, Wallace District #393, Weiser District #431, Wendell District #232, West Ada School District #2, West Bonner County District #83, West Jefferson District #253, West Side District #202, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Whitepine Joint District #288, Wilder District #133, Xavier Charter School LEA #462, iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of BKJ In Support of Opposition to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to BKJ Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to BKJ Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to BKJ Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to BKJ Affidavit)(Julian, Brian)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, REQUEST FOR HEARING re #50 MOTION to Certify Class T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Julian, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Protective Order Under F.R.C.P. 26(c), #52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 12/5/2019.(Wood, T)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Joinder in AJH Defendant's Motion to Extend Time (Dkt. 52) David Paul Gardner appearing for Defendant Twin Falls District #411. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Gardner, David)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Joinder in AJH Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order David Paul Gardner appearing for Defendant Twin Falls District #411. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Gardner, David)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Joinder in AJH Defendant's Motion to Extend Time (Dkt.52) David Paul Gardner appearing for Defendant Twin Falls District #411. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Gardner, David)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Brian K Julian appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Julian, Brian)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Protective Order Under F.R.C.P. 26(c) Brian K Julian appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B)(Julian, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Certify Class T Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiffs Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, T)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen re #48 Memorandum Decision,,, Order Staying Case,,, Terminate Motions,, ENTRY OF IDAHO SUPREME COURT DECISION (Wood, T)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER It is hereby ORDERED, that the motions to dismiss (docket nos. #35 , #36 & #45 ) are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. They are granted to the extent that they ask the Court to abstain and to STAY this litigation pending resolution of the Zeyen appeal in the Idaho Supreme Court. They are denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2019 re 35] MOTION to Dismiss and #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions deemed under advisement. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlb)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boise District #1.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/27/2018.(Julian, Brian)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Brian K Julian appearing for Defendants McCall- Donnelly District #421, Nezperce District #302, Orofino Joint District #171, Aberdeen District #58, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, American Falls Joint District #381, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Basin District #72, Bear Lake County District #33, Blackfoot District #55, Blaine County District #61, Bliss District #234, Boise District #1, Bonneville Joint District #93, Boundary County District #101, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Buhl Joint District #412, Butte County District #111, Caldwell District #132, Camas County District #121, Cambridge #432, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Cascade District #422, Cassia Joint District #151, Castleford District #417, Challis Joint District #181, Clark County District #161, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Connections Academy #457, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Council District #13, Dietrich District #314, Emmett Independent District #221, Filer District #413, Firth District #59, Fremont County Joint District #215, Fruitland District #373, Garden Valley District #71, Genesee Joint District #282, Glenns Ferry District #192, Gooding Joint District #231, Grace Joint District #148, Hagerman District #233, Hansen District #415, Highland District #305, Homedale Joint District #370, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Idaho Falls District #91, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Jerome Joint District #261, Kamiah Joint District #304, Kellogg Joint District #391, Kendrick District #283, Kimberly District #414, Kootenai District #274, Kuna Joint District #3, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Lakeland Joint District #272, Lewiston Independent District #340, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Mackay District #182, Madison District #321, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Marsing District #363, Meadows Valley District #11, Melba Joint District #136, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Middleton District #134, Midvale District #433, Minidoka County Joint District #331, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Moscow District #281, Mountain Home District #193, Mountain View District #244, Mullan District #392, Murtaugh District #418, Nampa District #131, New Plymouth School District #372, North Gem District #149, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, North Star Charter School LEA #493, Notus District #135, Oneida County District #351, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Parma District #137;, Payette Joint District #371, Pleasant Valley District #364, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Post Falls District #273, Potlatch District #285, Prairie Elementary District #191, Preston Joint District #201, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Richfield District #316, Ririe Joint District #252, Rockland District #382, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Salmon District #291, Salmon River Joint District #243, Shelley Joint District #60, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Snake River District #52, Soda Springs Joint District #150, South Lemhi School District #292, St. Maries Joint District #41, SugarSalem District #322, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Teton County District #401, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Troy District #287, Twin Falls District #411, Valley District #262, Vallivue District #139, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Wallace District #393, Weiser District #431, Wendell District #232, West Ada School District #2, West Bonner County District #83, West Jefferson District #253, West Side District #202, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Wilder District #133. Responses due by 1/16/2019 (Julian, Brian)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ERRATA by Defendant Boise District #1 re #35 MOTION to Dismiss . (Julian, Brian)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David P. Gardner)(Gardner, David)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. Replies due by 12/31/2018.(Wood, T)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mike Zeyen. Replies due by 12/28/2018.(Huntley, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #35 MOTION to Dismiss . Per Order dkt 40, Responses due by 12/14/2018 (jp)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #35 MOTION to Dismiss Robert C Huntley appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 12/25/2018 (Huntley, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by T Jason Wood (Wood, T)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #35 MOTION to Dismiss and #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Pursuant to Case Management Order #29 a Motion Hearing is set for 1/14/2019 at 9:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jlb)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Jetta Hatch Mathews appearing for Defendants McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411, Vallivue District #139. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Mathews, Jetta)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Brian K Julian appearing for Defendant Boise District #1. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit EXH. A-D, #3 Exhibit EXH. E-J)(Julian, Brian)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Vision Charter School is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, no costs or fees assessed to any party. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY ORDER -- granting #30 Motion to Dismiss certain defendants. The following defendants are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE and with no costs or fees assessed to any party: (1) Inspire Academies, Inc, #457 d/b/a INSPIRE Connections Academy, (2) Meridian Technical Charter High School; (3) Lapwai School District; (4) Heritage Community Charter School; (5) Kootenai Bridge Academy; (6) Payette River Regional Technical Academy; (7)Whitepine Joint School District; (8) Avery School District; (9)Artec Charter School; (10) iSucceed Virtual High School; (11) Falcon Ridge Public Charter School; and (12)North Valley Academy Charter School. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #30 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. The following defendants are dismissed: (1) Inspire Academies, Inc, #457 d/b/a INSPIRE Connections Academy, (2) Meridian Technical Charter High School; (3) Lapwai School District; (4) Heritage Community Charter School; (5) Kootenai Bridge Academy; (6) Payette River Regional Technical Academy; (7)Whitepine Joint School District; (8) Avery School District; (9)Artec Charter School; (10) iSucceed Virtual High School; (11) Falcon Ridge Public Charter School; and (12)North Valley Academy Charter School. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss VISION CHARTER SCHOOL Robert C Huntley appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 12/6/2018 (Huntley, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Twelve additional Defendants Robert C Huntley appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 11/22/2018 (Huntley, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ( The parties shall file preliminary motions on such issues as standing, abstention, due process, and the defendant class on or before November 20, 2018. In Court Hearing set for 1/14/2019 09:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The Court will set oral argument to resolve the preliminary motions on January 14, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise Idaho.) Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Plaintiff's Representations to Cour re Non-Complexity of This Case by Mike Zeyen re #26 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan, #27 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan, considerations for Management Hearing (Huntley, Robert) Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit text (jp).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by McCall- Donnelly District #421, Nezperce District #302, Orofino Joint District #171, ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331, Aberdeen District #58, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, Alturas International Academy LEA #495, American Falls Joint District #381, American Heritage Charter School LEA #482, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Arbon Elementary District #383, Avery District #394, Basin District #72, Bear Lake County District #33, Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485, Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477, Blackfoot District #55, Blaine County District #61, Bliss District #234, Boise District #1, Bonneville Joint District #93, Boundary County District #101, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Buhl Joint District #412, Butte County District #111, Caldwell District #132, Camas County District #121, Cambridge #432, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Cascade District #422, Cassia Joint District #151, Castleford District #417, Challis Joint District #181, Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483, Clark County District #161, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Connections Academy #457, Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Council District #13, Culdesac Joint District #342, Dietrich District #314, Emmett Independent District #221, Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456, Filer District #413, Firth District #59, Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487, Fremont County Joint District #215, Fruitland District #373, Garden Valley District #71, Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131, Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490, Genesee Joint District #282, Glenns Ferry District #192, Gooding Joint District #231, Grace Joint District #148, Hagerman District #233, Hansen District #415, Heritage Academy LEA #479, Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481, Highland District #305, Homedale Joint District #370, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131, Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469, Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490, Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596, Idaho Falls District #91, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489, Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452, Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Jerome Joint District #261, Kamiah Joint District #304, Kellogg Joint District #391, Kendrick District #283, Kimberly District #414, Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470, Kootenai District #274, Kuna Joint District #3, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Lakeland Joint District #272, Lapwai District #341, Legacy Charter School LEA #478, Lewiston Independent District #340, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Mackay District #182, Madison District #321, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Marsing District #363, Meadows Valley District #11, Melba Joint District #136, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Meridian Technical Charter High School, Middleton District #134, Midvale District #433, Minidoka County Joint District #331, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281, Moscow District #281, Mountain Home District #193, Mountain View District #244, Mullan District #392, Murtaugh District #418, Nampa District #131, New Plymouth School District #372, North Gem District #149, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, North Star Charter School LEA #493, North Valley Academy LEA #465, Notus District #135, Oneida County District #351, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Parma District #137;, Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc., Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc., Payette Joint District #371, Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221, Pleasant Valley District #364, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Post Falls District #273, Potlatch District #285, Prairie Elementary District #191, Preston Joint District #201, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Richfield District #316, Ririe Joint District #252, Rockland District #382, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Salmon District #291, Salmon River Joint District #243, Shelley Joint District #60, Shoshone Joint District #312, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Snake River District #52, Soda Springs Joint District #150, South Lemhi School District #292, St. Maries Joint District #41, SugarSalem District #322, Swan Valley District #92, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Teton County District #401, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Troy District #287, Twin Falls District #411, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486, Valley District #262, Vallivue District #139, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Vision Charter School LEA #463, Wallace District #393, Weiser District #431, Wendell District #232, West Ada School District #2, West Bonner County District #83, West Jefferson District #253, West Side District #202, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Whitepine Joint District #288, Wilder District #133, Xavier Charter School LEA #462, iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466. (Julian, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COURT that counsel James G. Reid wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Reid, James)
October 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Mike Zeyen. (Huntley, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Re Plaintiffs Motion (stipulated and unopposed) For Leave To Dismiss Twenty-five Parties Defendant granting #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Aberdeen District #58.(Julian, Brian)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED, that the motion to dismiss Defendants ( #19 ) is GRANTED, and that Pathways in Education-Idaho and Pathways in Education-Nampa are voluntarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with no costs assessed to either party, and the Court being fully advised in the premises; Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Twin Falls District #411.(Gardner, David)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wood, T)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Boise District #1 of Association of Counsel (Skinner, Daniel)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Two Pathways Schools Robert C Huntley appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Huntley, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Aberdeen District #58.(Julian, Brian)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss 25 school Districts Robert C Huntley appearing for Plaintiff Mike Zeyen. Responses due by 9/26/2018 (Huntley, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 1 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 10/23/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned District Judge hereby issues this order recusing himself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (so)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Edward J. Lodge no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-207-BLW (jp)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Lodge for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-207-EJL (jp)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney David Paul Gardner for Vallivue District #139 added. Attorney Jill S Holinka terminated. (Holinka, Jill)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Gardner on behalf of Compass Public Charter School LEA #455 (Gardner, David)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Vallivue District #139, Vision Charter School LEA #463 re #9 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/24/2018. (jp)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Holinka on behalf of Vallivue District #139, Vision Charter School LEA #463 (Holinka, Jill)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457 re #7 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/17/2018. (jp)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J Nick Crawford on behalf of Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457 (Crawford, J)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Culdesac Joint District #342, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Shoshone Joint District #312, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486 re #5 Notice of Appearance, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/27/2018. (jp)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Garrison Reid on behalf of Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Culdesac Joint District #342, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Shoshone Joint District #312, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486 (Reid, James)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411 re #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/20/2018. (jp)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Gardner on behalf of McCall- Donnelly District #421, Blaine County District #61, Caldwell District #132, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Madison District #321, Mountain Home District #193, Twin Falls District #411 (Gardner, David)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REDACTION Complaint by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. (Wood, T) Modified on 5/24/2018 to link to dkt #1 (jp).
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SECOND CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 1[] Complaint, filed by Olivia Zeyen, Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen has been sealed due to the inclusion of minor children's names in the document. The filing party shall re-submit their redacted complaint using "Redacted Document" located under Other Documents.(jp)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Olivia Zeyen, Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen has been sealed due to the inclusion of minor children's names in the document. The filing party shall re-submit their redacted complaint using "Redacted Document" located under Other Documents.(jp)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against McCall- Donnelly District #421, Nezperce District #302, Orofino Joint District #171, ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331, Aberdeen District #58, Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460, Alturas International Academy LEA #495, American Falls Joint District #381, American Heritage Charter School LEA #482, Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476, Anser Charter School Boise SD #1, Arbon Elementary District #383, Avery District #394, Basin District #72, Bear Lake County District #33, Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485, Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477, Blackfoot District #55, Blaine County District #61, Bliss District #234, Boise District #1, Bonneville Joint District #93, Boundary County District #101, Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365, Buhl Joint District #412, Butte County District #111, Caldwell District #132, Camas County District #121, Cambridge #432, Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555, Cascade District #422, Cassia Joint District #151, Castleford District #417, Challis Joint District #181, Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483, Clark County District #161, Coeur d'Alene District #271, Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491, Compass Public Charter School LEA #455, Connections Academy #457, Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460, Cottonwood Joint District #242, Council District #13, Culdesac Joint District #342, Dietrich District #314, Emmett Independent District #221, Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456, Filer District #413, Firth District #59, Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487, Fremont County Joint District #215, Fruitland District #373, Garden Valley District #71, Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131, Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490, Genesee Joint District #282, Glenns Ferry District #192, Gooding Joint District #231, Grace Joint District #148, Hagerman District #233, Hansen District #415, Heritage Academy LEA #479, Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481, Highland District #305, Homedale Joint District #370, Horseshoe Bend School District #73, Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131, Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469, Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490, Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596, Idaho Falls District #91, Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468, Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489, Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452, Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457, Jefferson County Joint District #251, Jerome Joint District #261, Kamiah Joint District #304, Kellogg Joint District #391, Kendrick District #283, Kimberly District #414, Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470, Kootenai District #274, Kuna Joint District #3, Lake Pend Oreille District #84, Lakeland Joint District #272, Lapwai District #341, Legacy Charter School LEA #478, Lewiston Independent District #340, Liberty Charter School LEA #458, Mackay District #182, Madison District #321, Marsh Valley Joint District #21, Marsing District #363, Meadows Valley District #11, Melba Joint District #136, Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School, Meridian Technical Charter High School, Middleton District #134, Midvale District #433, Minidoka County Joint District #331, Monticello Montessori School LEA #474, Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281, Moscow District #281, Mountain Home District #193, Mountain View District #244, Mullan District #392, Murtaugh District #418, Nampa District #131, New Plymouth School District #372, North Gem District #149, North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480, North Star Charter School LEA #493, North Valley Academy LEA #465, Notus District #135, Oneida County District #351, Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472, Parma District #137;, Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc., Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc., Payette Joint District #371, Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221, Pleasant Valley District #364, Plummer/Worley Joint District #44, Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494, Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25, Post Falls District #273, Potlatch District #285, Prairie Elementary District #191, Preston Joint District #201, Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453, Richfield District #316, Ririe Joint District #252, Rockland District #382, Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454, SEI Tec Preston School District #201, Sage International School of Boise LEA #475, Salmon District #291, Salmon River Joint District #243, Shelley Joint District #60, Shoshone Joint District #312, Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537, Snake River District #52, Soda Springs Joint District #150, South Lemhi School District #292, St. Maries Joint District #41, SugarSalem District #322, Swan Valley District #92, Syringa Mountain School LEA #488, Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461, Teton County District #401, The Village Charter School LEA #473, Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139, Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416, Troy District #287, Twin Falls District #411, Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486, Valley District #262, Vallivue District #139, Victory Charter School LEA #451, Vision Charter School LEA #463, Wallace District #393, Weiser District #431, Wendell District #232, West Ada School District #2, West Bonner County District #83, West Jefferson District #253, West Side District #202, White Pine Charter School LEA #464, Whitepine Joint District #288, Wilder District #133, Xavier Charter School LEA #462, iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1734531.), filed by Rachael Booth, Kim Wood, Mike Zeyen, Olivia Zeyen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wood, T) Modified on 5/15/2018 to seal complaint and summons due to minor child's names (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeyen et al v. Boise District #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richfield District #316
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moscow Charter School Moscow School District #281
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise District #1
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Joint District #148
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Carmen Public Charter School LEA #486
Represented By: James Garrison Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Virtual Academy LEA #452
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell District #132
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullan District #392
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Educational Services for the Deaf and the Blind #596
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge #432
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTEC Charter School Minidoka SD #331
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middleton District #134
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai Bridge Academy LEA #470
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Joint District #251
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont County Joint District #215
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade District #422
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gem Prep: Nampa Nampa SD #131
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garden Valley District #71
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Joint District #201
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anser Charter School Boise SD #1
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoshone-Bannock Joint District #537
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathways in Education - Nampa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minidoka County Joint District #331
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swan Valley District #92
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parma District #137;
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plummer/Worley Joint District #44
Represented By: James Garrison Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon District #291
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Creek Joint Elementary School District #416
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleford District #417
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocatello Community Charter School LEA# 494
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iSucceed Virtual High School LEA #466
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Charter School LEA #478
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell District #232
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCall- Donnelly District #421
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filer District #413
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy at Roosevelt Center (ARC) #460
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsing District #363
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County District #161
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassia Joint District #151
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bliss District #234
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Academy LEA #479
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Ada School District #2
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackfoot Charter Community Learning Center LEA #477
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Charter School LEA #463
Represented By: Jill S Holinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moscow District #281
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Science & Technology Charter School LEA #468
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls District #411
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace District #393
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gem Prep: Pocatello IDEA LEA #490
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snake River District #52
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coeur dAlene Charter Academy LEA #491
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery District #394
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midvale District #433
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Falls District #273
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadows Valley District #11
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syringa Mountain School LEA #488
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village Charter School LEA #473
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homedale Joint District #370
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest M. Bird Charter School LEA #487
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alturas International Academy LEA #495
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gooding Joint District #231
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teton County District #401
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McKenna Charter School LEA #453
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soda Springs Joint District #150
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bonner County District #83
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palouse Prairie Charter School LEA #472
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Hills Charter School LEA #454
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coeur d'Alene District #271
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockland District #382
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Pine Charter School LEA #464
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ririe Joint District #252
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathways in Eduction - Idaho, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiser District #431
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackay District #182
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Arts Charter School Nampa #131
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Charter School LEA #462
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Gem District #149
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitepine Joint District #288
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Joint District #261
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culdesac Joint District #342
Represented By: James Garrison Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Public Charter School LEA #455
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocatello/Chubbuck District #25
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boundary County District #101
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Connections Academy LEA #457
Represented By: J Nick Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buhl Joint District #412
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council District #13
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Joint District #272
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai District #274
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon River Joint District #243
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewiston Independent District #340
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Technical Charter High School
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Home District #193
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagerman District #233
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh Valley Joint District #21
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain View District #244
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin District #72
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Lemhi School District #292
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackfoot District #55
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamiah Joint District #304
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Falls District #91
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland District #305
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Falls Joint District #381
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lapwai District #341
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmett Independent District #221
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuna Joint District #3
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingham Academy Blackfoot, ID LEA #485
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly District #414
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jefferson Charter School Vallivue School District #139
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Maries Joint District #41
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley District #364
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Lake County District #33
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbon Elementary District #383
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylors Crossing Public Charter School LEA #461
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Pend Oreille District #84
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoshone Joint District #312
Represented By: James Garrison Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potlatch District #285
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick District #283
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notus District #135
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley District #262
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SugarSalem District #322
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Elementary District #191
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Charter School LEA #458
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monticello Montessori School LEA #474
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melba Joint District #136
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Technical and Career Academy LEA # 489
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Charter School LEA #493
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horseshoe Bend School District #73
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage International School of Boise LEA #475
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee Joint District #282
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Joint District #60
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Tec Preston School District #201
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Joint District #242
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Targhee Elementary Academy LEA #483
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville Joint District #93
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Side District #202
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenns Ferry District #192
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dietrich District #314
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nampa District #131
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Connects Online School (ICON) LEA #469
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections Academy #457
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon-Owhyee School Service Agency #555
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orofino Joint District #171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payette Joint District #371
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County District #111
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Community Charter School LEA #481
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Joint District #391
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Distance Education Academy (I-DEA) LEA #490
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruitland District #373
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine County District #61
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen District #415
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aberdeen District #58
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Medical Arts Charter High School
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payette River Technical Academy Emmett School District #221
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Valley Academy LEA #465
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Academy Public Charter School LEA #460
Represented By: James Garrison Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Charter School LEA #451
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Ridge Public Charter School #456
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challis Joint District #181
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison District #321
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heritage Charter School LEA #482
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camas County District #121
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nezperce District #302
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Plymouth School District #372
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Idaho STEM Charter Academy LEA #480
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruneau-Grand View Joint School District #365
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firth District #59
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County District #351
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallivue District #139
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Represented By: Jetta Hatch Mathews
Represented By: Jill S Holinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murtaugh District #418
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Another Choice Virtual Charter School LEA #476
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jefferson District #253
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilder District #133
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Represented By: Andrea Julian Fontaine
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Zeyen
Represented By: Robert C Huntley
Represented By: T Jason Wood
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Zeyen
Represented By: Robert C Huntley
Represented By: T Jason Wood
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Booth
Represented By: Robert C Huntley
Represented By: T Jason Wood
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Wood
Represented By: Robert C Huntley
Represented By: T Jason Wood
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy District #287
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?