All Things, LLC v. Aydin

Plaintiff: Mehmet Aydin and All Things, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00282
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 The Clerk closed this case pursuant to the #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cjs)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Things, LLC (Wilson, Brent)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 8/14/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 22, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by All Things, LLC. (Wilson, Brent)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (No. Unknown) (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (cjs)
June 22, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by All Things, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case as the required Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The Civil Cover Sheet is available on our Court website. The filing party shall submit their cover sheet filing using the event of "Civil Cover Sheet" located under Other Documents.(cjs)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mehmet Aydin ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1752850.), filed by All Things, LLC.(Wilson, Brent) Modified on 6/26/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Things, LLC v. Aydin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehmet Aydin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Things, LLC
Represented By: Brent Russel Wilson
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?