Rao et al v. St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, LTD et al
Plaintiff: JHHR Medical Associates, LLC, James H Rao and M.D. James H Rao
Defendant: Brian Fortuin, Daryl Ficklin, St. Luke's Magic Valley Medical Center, St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd., D.O. Daryl Ficklin and M.D. Brian Fortuin
Case Number: 1:2018cv00286
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Twin Falls - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Daryl Ficklin, Brian Fortuin, JHHR Medical Associates, LLC, James H Rao, St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd. re #2 Amended Complaint, #8 Answer to Amended Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/1/2018. (km)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2018 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 9/4/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 St. Luke's, Dr. Fortuin and Dr. Ficklin's ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dominick, Bobbi)
July 10, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint and Summons served on St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd. et al. on 07/02/2018, filed by JHHR Medical Associates, LLC, James H Rao. (Thomas, William)
July 9, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case randomly reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-00286-BLW. (km)
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H Rao, JHHR Medical Associates, LLC. Brian Fortuin served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (Thomas, William)
June 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H Rao, JHHR Medical Associates, LLC. Daryl Ficklin served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Thomas, William)
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daryl Ficklin, Brian Fortuin, St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jp)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another magistrate judge or to a district judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (ah)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daryl Ficklin, Brian Fortuin, St. Luke's Magic Valley Medical Center, filed by James H Rao, JHHR Medical Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Professional Service Agreement)(Thomas, William)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daryl Ficklin, Brian Fortuin, St. Luke's Magic Valley Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1754007.), filed by James H Rao, JHHR Medical Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Daryl Ficklin, #3 Summons Brian Fortuin)(Thomas, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rao et al v. St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fortuin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Ficklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Magic Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, Ltd.
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Bobbi K Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Daryl Ficklin
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Bobbi K Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Brian Fortuin
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Bobbi K Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHHR Medical Associates, LLC
Represented By: William H Thomas
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Rao
Represented By: William H Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. James H Rao
Represented By: William H Thomas
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?