Keller v. Keller

Plaintiff: Kristine D Keller
Defendant: Kimberley Ann Keller
Case Number: 1:2018cv00308
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Amendment of Filing Date and/or Extension of Filing Date by Plaintiff Kristine D Keller. Responses due by 8/24/2018 (st)
July 18, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 Complaint filed by Kristine D Keller was filed without parties listed in the caption or a civil cover sheet. The filing party shall re-submit their corrected page 1 of their complaint and cover sheet. (jp)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp) (civil cover sheet form also mailed to plaintiff)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kimberley Ann Keller, filed by Kristine D Keller. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #2 copy of envelope) (jp).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis & Request to Seal by Plaintiff Kristine D Keller. Responses due by 8/3/2018 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine D Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Ann Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?