Reynard v. Green Valley Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Janine P Reynard
Defendant: Green Valley Holdings, LLC and Lorene Hillman
In Re: Timothy Resler and Kimberly Resler
Case Number: 1:2018cv00311
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Reslers Motion to Withdraw Reference (Dkt. #1 ) is hereby GRANTED. As outlined below, once the Bankruptcy Court certifies the case is ready for trial the Court will withdraw the reference. 2. The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and nondispositive motions. If either party files a dispositive motion, the bankruptcy court will entertain that motion and submit proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, and a recommendation for disposition to this Court. 3. If and when it becomes clear that a jury trial will be necessary, and the case is prepared and ready for trial to begin, the Bankruptcy Court shall so certify to this Court and the reference will be withdrawn at that time. 4. Until the Bankruptcy Court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceedings in the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)(Emailed to TLM, sh, mb & kb at Bankruptcy Court.)
July 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Replies due by 7/20/2018. Pursuant to Order Dkt. 3 in related miscellaneous case 1:18-mc-10143-DCN.(cjs)
July 3, 2018 Filing 2 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Janine P Reynard. Replies due by 7/17/2018.(cjs)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Nolan R Sorensen appearing for Defendant Green Valley Holdings, LLC, Miscellaneous Case No 1:18-mc-10143-DCN, Adversary Case No. 17-06008-TLM. (Fee Amount $181 paid in Bankruptcy Court, Receipt # 6729120) (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet)(cjs)(Emailed TLM, mb, sh & kb at Bankruptcy Court.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2018: #2 Miscellaneous Docket Sheet) (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynard v. Green Valley Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine P Reynard
Represented By: Jed W Manwaring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Valley Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nolan R Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorene Hillman
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Timothy Resler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kimberly Resler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?