Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC v. Twin Falls NSC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Defendant: Twin Falls NSC, LLC and AmSurg Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00364
Filed: August 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Twin Falls - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/30/2018 09:30 AM ( MOUNTAIN TIME) in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Plaintiff's Counsel shall initiate the Conference call and connect the Court at (208) 334-1495.(lc)s
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT re: Service of Process [L.R. 4.1] by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Rosa, Angelo)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AmSurg Holdings, Inc., Twin Falls NSC, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons AmSurg Holdings, Inc)(cjs)
August 19, 2018 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # 0976-1774719 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
August 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (cjs)
August 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmSurg Holdings, Inc., Twin Falls NSC, LLC, filed by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Twin Falls NSC, LLC, #3 Summons AmSurg Holdings, Inc.)(cjs)(Filed for attorney due to ECF issues.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC v. Twin Falls NSC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Angelo Luigi Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls NSC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmSurg Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?