RLI Corp. a/s/o Jack E. Crans v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Plaintiff: RLI Corp. a/s/o Jack E. Crans
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00368
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Eaton, Dylan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 DISCOVERY PLAN by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company . (Eaton, Dylan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shauna W Avrith for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Anthony F Latiolait for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; approving #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Bret R Henry for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Bret R. Henry. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1784414.)Dylan Alexander Eaton appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Responses due by 10/2/2018 (Eaton, Dylan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Anthony F. Latiolait. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1784410.)Dylan Alexander Eaton appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Responses due by 10/2/2018 (Eaton, Dylan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1784405.)Dylan Alexander Eaton appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Responses due by 10/2/2018 (Eaton, Dylan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Eaton, Dylan)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 10/17/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Eaton, Dylan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 ERRATA by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #4 Supplement with Docket Items Inadvertantly Left Out of Original Supplement Filing. (Eaton, Dylan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Eaton, Dylan)
August 21, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company should have the State Court docket attached. The filing party shall file the State Court docket using the event 'Supplement' located under civil, other filings, other documents. Please link it to docket #1. (st)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (st)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for RLI Corp. a/s/o Jack E. Crans and The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/22/2018. (st)
August 20, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company served on 8/20/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Dylan Alexander Eaton appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Responses due by 9/10/2018 (Eaton, Dylan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Goodyer Tire & Rubber Company from District Court of the Third Judicial District, Canyon County, case number CV14-18-07506.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1775236.), filed by The Goodyer Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Paula B. Christ, #3 Affidavit of Dylan A. Eaton, #4 Exhibit to Declaration og Dylan A. Eaton)(Eaton, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLI Corp. a/s/o Jack E. Crans v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLI Corp. a/s/o Jack E. Crans
Represented By: Louis Vaughn Spiker
Represented By: Janine P Reynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Represented By: Bret R Henry
Represented By: Anthony F Latiolait
Represented By: Shauna W Avrith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?