Hunn v. Pugmire Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Hunn
Defendant: Leslie Pugmire, Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc., Pugmire Properties, LLC and Nathan Pugmire
Case Number: 1:2018cv00374
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Dkt. 16). The parties agreed to a five-day extension of time for Defendant Transnation Title & Escrow dba Fidelity National Title Company to file a responsive pleading. In light of the parties' agreement and the relatively short extension requested, the Court finds good cause to grant the motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kld)
October 17, 2018 Filing 24 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/17/2018. (cjs)
October 17, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #18 Memorandum/Brief (generic) filed by Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The Court prefers the memorandum be filed as an attachment to the motion it supports but when filed separately the correct event is "Memorandum in Support of Motion" located under Responses and Replies.No action is needed by the filing party as the Clerk's Office will edit the entry.(cjs)
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion filed by Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. In Support to Fidelity's Motion to Dismiss Fugmires' Cross-Claims FRCP 12(b)(6) re #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Cleverley, Matthew) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit & create link (cjs).
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Pugmire's Cross Claims FRCP 12(b)(6) Matthew R Cleverley appearing for Cross Defendant Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Cleverley, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 Pugmire Parties' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. by Leslie Pugmire, Nathan Pugmire, Pugmire Properties, LLC.(Bower, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pugmire Properties, LLC. (Bower, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion filed by Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc re #17 Motion to Dismiss. . (Cleverley, Matthew) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit 7 create link per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Matthew R Cleverley appearing for Defendant Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2018 (Cleverley, Matthew)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Matthew R Cleverley appearing for Defendant Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2018 (Cleverley, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. (Cleverley, Matthew)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Spencer Hunn, Leslie Pugmire, Nathan Pugmire, Pugmire Properties, LLC, Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/26/2018. (cjs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Cleverley on behalf of Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. (Cleverley, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Pugmire Parties' Responsive Pleading. The parties have agreed to extend the time for Defendants Pugmire Properties, LLC; Leslie Pugmire; and Nathan Pugmire to file a response to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Finding good cause for the 21-day extension requested, the time set for a response is hereby extended to October 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kld)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Daniel W Bower appearing for Defendants Leslie Pugmire, Nathan Pugmire, Pugmire Properties, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Bower, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hunn. Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Davis, Patrick)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hunn. Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc. served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Davis, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 ransnation Title & Escrow, Inc - Irvine, CA)(cjs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hunn. Pugmire Properties, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Davis, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hunn. Nathan Pugmire served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Davis, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hunn. Leslie Pugmire served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Davis, Patrick)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 10/31/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leslie Pugmire, Nathan Pugmire, Pugmire Properties, LLC, Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Leslie Pugmire, #2 Summons Nathan Pugmire, #3 Summons Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc)(cjs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Spencer Hunn re #1 Complaint. Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Davis, Patrick) Modified on 8/27/2018 to edit text and create link (cjs).
August 24, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Spencer Hunn was filed incorrectly in this case. The Complaint only should be the main document, the civil cover sheet and Summonses should be additional individual attachments to the Complaints.The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing using the event of "Amended Document" located under Other Documents and link to Dkt. 1. DO NOT USE event of Amended Complaint.(cjs)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Spencer Hunn against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1777656.), filed by Spencer Hunn.(Davis, Patrick) Modified on 8/27/2018 to refer to Dkt. #2 for correctly filed Complaint (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunn v. Pugmire Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Pugmire
Represented By: Daniel W Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transnation Title & Escrow, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R Cleverley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pugmire Properties, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Pugmire
Represented By: Daniel W Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Hunn
Represented By: Patrick James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?