Balderas, Jr. et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cody Tennant, Armando Balderas, Jr., Jon Ransom, William Scobby, Jay Bartolome, Dustin Horn and Octavio Gonzalez
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00378
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Salmi, Christine)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) filed by Armando Balderas, Jr., Jay Bartolome, Octavio Gonzalez, Dustin Horn, Jon Ransom, William Scobby, Cody Tennant. Replies due by 10/12/2018.(Nicholson, Chad)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e). Responses due by 9/28/2018. (Per Order, dkt #7)(st)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadlines to respond to Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) be modified as follows: Plaintiffs' deadline to respond shall be extended from September 25, 2018 to 9/28/2018. Defendant shall also receive an additional 4 days to file a reply. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #5 Errata, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) by Armando Balderas, Jr., Jay Bartolome, Octavio Gonzalez, Dustin Horn, Jon Ransom, William Scobby, Cody Tennant. (Nicholson, Chad)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 ERRATA by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) (re-filing signed Memorandum). (Salmi, Christine)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP12(b), or for More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) Christine Salmi appearing for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Deborah Ostendorp, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Salmi, Christine)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Armando Balderas, Jr., Jay Bartolome, Octavio Gonzalez, Dustin Horn, Jon Ransom, William Scobby, Cody Tennant, and United Parcel Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/29/2018. (st)
August 27, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - United Parcel Service, Inc. served on 8/27/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service, Inc... (Salmi, Christine)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service, Inc. of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1441(a) (Federal Question) (Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1778136.), filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Summary, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Amended Summons, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #6 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Salmi, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balderas, Jr. et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Tennant
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Balderas, Jr.
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Ransom
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scobby
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Bartolome
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Horn
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Gonzalez
Represented By: Lars Lundberg
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Salmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?