Summit Funding, Inc. v. Leammon et al

Plaintiff: Summit Funding, Inc.
Defendant: Britney Roberts, Jennie Leammon and Callie Bates
Case Number: 1:2018cv00379
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 DISCOVERY PLAN by Summit Funding, Inc. . (Bolinger, Dane)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Summit Funding, Inc.. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jennie Leammon re #15 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/26/2018. (jp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Britney Roberts.(Guerricabeitia, Edward)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jennie Leammon.(Nicholson, Chad)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 10/23/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Britney Roberts, Summit Funding, Inc. re #12 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/19/2018. (cjs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by E Don Copple on behalf of Britney Roberts (Copple, E)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jennie Leammon answer due 9/25/2018. (see corrective entry) (jp)
September 13, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #11 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Summit Funding, Inc. was filed using the wrong event which generated the incorrect answer due date. For future reference the correct docket event is "Summons Returned Executed." The correct answer due date for defendant Jennie Leammon is 9/25/18, not 11/5/18.(jp)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Summit Funding, Inc.. Jennie Leammon waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Summit Funding, Inc.. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Funding, Inc.. Britney Roberts served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Funding, Inc.. Callie Bates served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 6, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #7 Affidavit of Service and #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Summit Funding, Inc. was filed using the wrong event. The filing party shall re-submit these filings using the event Summons Returned Executed so that an answer deadline is generated.(st)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; and Summons served on Brittney Roberts on 8/28/18, filed by Summit Funding, Inc.. (Bolinger, Dane)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; and Summons served on Callie Bates on 8/28/18, filed by Summit Funding, Inc.. (Bolinger, Dane)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher S. Alvarez for Summit Funding, Inc. ; approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Alden J Parker for Summit Funding, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Callie Bates, Jennie Leammon, and Britney Roberts. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Britney Roberts summons, #2 Jennie Leammon summons)(st)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Alden J. Parker. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1778282.)Dane Andrew Bolinger appearing for Plaintiff Summit Funding, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Bolinger, Dane)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Alvarez. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1778269.)Dane Andrew Bolinger appearing for Plaintiff Summit Funding, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Bolinger, Dane)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1778215.), filed by Summit Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Britney Roberts, #2 Summons Callie Bates, #3 Summons Jennie Leammon, #4 Cover Sheet)(Bolinger, Dane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Funding, Inc. v. Leammon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Roberts
Represented By: E Don Copple
Represented By: Edward J Guerricabeitia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Leammon
Represented By: Michael A. Short
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callie Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Lynnette Michele Davis
Represented By: Dane Andrew Bolinger
Represented By: Christopher S. Alvarez
Represented By: Alden J Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?