Wardle v. KeyBank et al

Plaintiff: Brian Wardle
Defendant: KeyBank and Keybank National Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv00382
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Keybank National Association.(Leachman, Tamsen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KeyBank, Keybank National Association identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for Keybank National Association.. (Leachman, Tamsen)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 10/31/2018 for the Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for KeyBank, Keybank National Association, Brian Wardle re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/29/2018. (cjs)
August 29, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - KeyBank served on 8/28/2018; Keybank National Association served on 8/28/2018. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Tamsen L. Leachman re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KeyBank, Keybank National Association . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Case Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Leachman, Tamsen) Modified on 8/29/2018 to edit text (cjs).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District of the State of Idaho, County of Ada, case number CV01-18-14160.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1779157.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Leachman, Tamsen) Modified on 8/29/2018 to refer to Dkt. #2 for State Court Documents (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wardle v. KeyBank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank
Represented By: Tamsen L Leachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank National Association
Represented By: Tamsen L Leachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wardle
Represented By: Chip Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?