Ericsson, Inc v. Larson Tower Specialists, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ericsson, Inc
Defendant: Sorensen Construction, Inc., Larson Tower Specialists, LLC and Stockton Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00389
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Ericsson, Inc. (Fibel, Lauren)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN by Ericsson, Inc . (Fibel, Lauren)
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Summons and Complaint and Certificate of Service by Ericsson, Inc. (Fibel, Lauren)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/15/2018 11:00 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/31/2018 01:30 PM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 10/24/2018. (at)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Lauren M Fibel for Ericsson, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Lauren M. Fibel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1794641.)Samuel L Linnet appearing for Plaintiff Ericsson, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2018 (Linnet, Samuel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sorensen Construction, Inc.. (Janicki, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Larson Tower Specialists, LLC. (Mitchell, Hans)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Sorensen Construction, Inc..(Janicki, Robert)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Larson Tower Specialists, LLC.(Mitchell, Hans)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 10/9/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lloyd Ford on behalf of Sorensen Construction, Inc. (Ford, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Larson Tower Specialists, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Docket Sheet. (Mitchell, Hans)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Janicki on behalf of Sorensen Construction, Inc. (Janicki, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants. 1. (st)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (st)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ericsson, Inc, Larson Tower Specialists, LLC, and Sorensen Construction, Inc., Stockton Construction, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/5/2018. (st)
September 4, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Larson Tower Specialists, LLC should have the State Court docket attached. The filing party shall file the State Court docket using the event supplement located under civil events, other filings, other documents. (st)
August 31, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Larson Tower Specialists, LLC served on 8/31/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Larson Tower Specialists, LLC from District Court of the Third Judicial District of the State of Idaho, in and for the County of Washington, case number CV44-18-1206.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1780638.), filed by Larson Tower Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Consent to removal - Sorensen, #3 Exhibit Consent to removal - Stockton, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in State Court)(Mitchell, Hans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericsson, Inc v. Larson Tower Specialists, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorensen Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Ford
Represented By: Robert L Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larson Tower Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Hans A Mitchell
Represented By: Cody Lynn Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockton Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsson, Inc
Represented By: Lauren M Fibel
Represented By: Samuel L Linnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?