Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired
Defendant: Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC, United States Department of Energy and Rick Perry
Case Number: 1:2018cv00402
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 25 JUDGMENT - case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall be closed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired (Warr, Adam)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DKT. #2 ) - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired.(Warr, Adam)
September 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 10:a.m. on 9/20/2018. Order Dkt. #10 .(cjs)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC Declaration of Wendy Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit A 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit B 1 of 6, #5 Exhibit B 2 of 6, #6 Exhibit B 3 of 6, #7 Exhibit B 4 of 6, #8 Exhibit B 5 of 6, #9 Exhibit B 6 of 6, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F 1 of 2, #14 Exhibit F 2 of 2, #15 Exhibit G 1 of 3, #16 Exhibit G 2 of 3, #17 Exhibit G 3 of 3, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit J 1 of 2, #21 Exhibit J 2 of 2, #22 Exhibit K)(Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC Declaration of Randy Strong. (Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC Declaration of Matthew C Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A 2 of 2)(Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to File Overlength Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC. Replies due by 10/3/2018.(Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Finding good cause for the request, it is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kld)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to File Overlength Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Phillip S Oberrecht appearing for Defendant Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rick Perry, United States Department of Energy. Replies due by 10/3/2018.(Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip S Oberrecht on behalf of Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC (Oberrecht, Phillip)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Warr, Adam)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. Rick Perry served on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; United States Department of Energy served on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Warr, Adam)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rick Perry, Jeff Sessions on 09-18-2018, filed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. (Warr, Adam)
September 18, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 9/19/2018. Replies due by 10:00 a.m. on 9/20/2018. Order Dkt. #10 .(cjs)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #2 ) by September 19, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a reply, if any, on or before 10:00 a.m. on September 20, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff provide Defendants with notice of this Order as soon as possible and consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a). Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 17, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Lodge for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-402-EJL. (cjs)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - In light of the short timeframe in which Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction would ideally be heard and decided, the Court finds that the additional delay imposed by the typical consent process (and even an abbreviated consent process) would unnecessarily hinder adecision on the merits, in a setting where urgency is paramount. Accordingly, the undersigned finds that the most appropriate path forward is to reassign this case to a district judge without further delay. Because not all named parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United StatesMagistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this case in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and/or FRCP 73, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Rick Perry, United States Department of Energy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
September 17, 2018 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # IDX100022940 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Status Conference held on 9/17/2018. Adam Warr for Pltff, Nick Woychick, not of record, Phil Oberrecht and Matt Parks, not of record. Defendants advised they have not been served. Court and counsel discussed this matter as stated on the record. Court shall enter an Order in due course. (Court Reporter/ESR lcase.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Clerical/ Correct Date is Mon. 9/17/18. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/17/2018 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. (lc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/18/2018 01:30 PM Mountain Time in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Mr. Warr shall initiate this Conference Call, and connect the Court at 208-334-1495.(lc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. (Warr, Adam)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Adam Christopher Warr appearing for Plaintiff Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Memo Cases, #3 Exhibit Memo, Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Memo, Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Memo, Ex. 3, #6 Affidavit Beck Declaration, #7 Exhibit Beck Decl, Ex. 1, #8 Exhibit Beck Decl., Ex. 2, #9 Exhibit Beck Decl., Ex. 3, #10 Affidavit Bresina Declaration, #11 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 1, #12 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 2, #13 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 3, #14 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 4, #15 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 5, #16 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 6 (RFP), #17 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 6 (SOW), #18 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 7 (RFP), #19 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 7 (SOW, #20 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 8, #21 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 9, #22 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 10, #23 Exhibit Bresina Decl., Ex. 11)(Warr, Adam) Modified on 9/17/2018 (cjs).
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Arbitration, #2 Summons DOE, #3 Summons Battelle, #4 Cover Sheet)(Warr, Adam) Modified on 9/17/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Phillip S Oberrecht
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perry
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired
Represented By: Adam Christopher Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?