Mahoney v. Emerson Electric Co. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Mahoney
Defendant: Paksense, Inc., Emersub XCI, Inc. and Emerson Electric Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00405
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Idaho District Court
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc..(Smith, Barbara)
November 5, 2018 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas Mahoney.(Hancock, Nicole)
November 2, 2018 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
October 24, 2018 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Thomas Mahoney. Replies due by 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Hancock, #2 Exhibit A to Hancock Decl.)(Hancock, Nicole)
October 24, 2018 16 MOTION to Seal Barbara A Smith appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clellen Ip)(Smith, Barbara)
October 24, 2018 15 Joint MOTION to Seal Barbara A Smith appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Smith, Barbara)
October 22, 2018 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Replies due by 11/5/2018.(Smith, Barbara)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 10/24/2018. (Per Order, docket #13)(st)
October 15, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS granting #12 Stipulation. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 12, 2018 12 STIPULATION re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Extend Deadline to Respond by Thomas Mahoney. (Hancock, Nicole)
October 1, 2018 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Nicole C Hancock appearing for Plaintiff Thomas Mahoney. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hancock, Nicole)
September 24, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER- NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Seal (Dkt. #9 )is GRANTED. The Merger Agreement (Dkt. #1 -6) and the Provision (Dkt #1 -7) shall be FILED UNDER SEAL UNTIL OCTOBER 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 21, 2018 9 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal,, Stephen R Thomas appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Suggestion in Support)(Thomas, Stephen)
September 21, 2018 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Stephen R Thomas appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Leadlove, #3 Exhibit A to Leadlove Declaration)(Thomas, Stephen)
September 21, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Paksense, Inc... (Thomas, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 , #3 , #4 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney's Herbert R Giorgo, Jr,Barbara A Smith and Mark B Leadlove for all defendants. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
September 18, 2018 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Thomas Mahoney, Paksense, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/19/2018. (hs)
September 17, 2018 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Herbert R. Giorgio, Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1786828.)Stephen R Thomas appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 10/8/2018 (Thomas, Stephen)
September 14, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (hs)
September 14, 2018 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Barbara Smith. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1786381.)Stephen R Thomas appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Thomas, Stephen)
September 14, 2018 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1786378.)Stephen R Thomas appearing for Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Emersub XCI, Inc., Paksense, Inc.. Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Thomas, Stephen)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paksense, Inc., Emersub XCI, Inc., Emerson Electric Co. from Fourth District, Ada County, case number cv01-18-15435.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1786369.), filed by Paksense, Inc., Emersub XCI, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit A2 Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit A3 Summons, #5 Exhibit A4 Affidavits of Service, #6 Exhibit B Agreement and Plan of Merger, #7 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Stephen) Modified on 9/24/2018 to reflect Attachments 6 7 7 Filed Under seal until 10/24/2018 by Order Dkt. #10 (cjs). Modified on 10/25/2018 to unseal dke 1-6 and 1-7 per the Order dkt #10 (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paksense, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Represented By: Mark B Leadlove
Represented By: Herbert R Giorgio, Jr
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emersub XCI, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Represented By: Mark B Leadlove
Represented By: Herbert R Giorgio, Jr
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Represented By: Mark B Leadlove
Represented By: Herbert R Giorgio, Jr
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mahoney
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?