Grant v. Key et al
Plaintiff: David M. Grant
Defendant: Payette Police Department, City of Fruitland, Ben Branham, Duane Higley, Fruitland City Police Department, Benjamin Key, J.D. Huff, City of Payette, Mark Clark and John or Jane Doe #1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00411
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 12/11/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and the Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 03:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ben Branham, City of Payette, Mark Clark, Duane Higley, Payette Police Department.(Kane, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ben Branham, City of Fruitland, City of Payette, Mark Clark, Fruitland City Police Department, David M. Grant, Duane Higley, J.D. Huff, Benjamin Key, Payette Police Department re #4 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/17/2018. (cjs)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Elia on behalf of City of Fruitland, Fruitland City Police Department, J.D. Huff, Benjamin Key (Elia, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Fruitland, Benjamin Key, Fruitland City Police Department, J.D. Huff. City of Fruitland waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; Benjamin Key waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; Fruitland City Police Department waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; J.D. Huff waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Elia, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Kane on behalf of Ben Branham, City of Payette, Mark Clark, Duane Higley, Payette Police Department (Kane, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Payette, Payette Police Department, Duane Higley, Ben Branham, Mark Clark. City of Payette waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018; Payette Police Department waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018; Duane Higley waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018; Ben Branham waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018; Mark Clark waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Kane, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ben Branham, City of Payette, Mark Clark, Fruitland City Police Department, Duane Higley, J.D. Huff, Benjamin Key, Payette Police Department. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Fruitland City Police Department, #2 Summons Issued J.D. Huff, #3 Summons Issued City of Payette, #4 Summons Issued Payette Police Department, #5 Summons Issued Ben Branham, #6 Summons Issued Duane Higley, #7 Summons Issued Mark Clark)(cjs)(Summons not submitted for City of Fruitland.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1789647.), filed by David M. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Branham, #3 Summons City of Payette, #4 Summons Higley, #5 Summons Fruitland City Police, #6 Summons J. D. Huff, #7 Summons Benjamin Key, #8 Summons Mark Clark, #9 Summons Payette Police Department)(Monteleone, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Key et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payette Police Department
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fruitland
Represented By: Michael J Elia
Represented By: Steven R Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Branham
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Higley
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruitland City Police Department
Represented By: Michael J Elia
Represented By: Steven R Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Key
Represented By: Michael J Elia
Represented By: Steven R Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Huff
Represented By: Michael J Elia
Represented By: Steven R Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Payette
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Clark
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Grant
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?