Tobias v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Samuel Tobias
Defendant: Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc., Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Swift Leasing Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC and Israel Z Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2018cv00416
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 Quemetco Defendants' ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc..(Anderson, Tyler)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Israel Z Rodriguez, Swift Leasing Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC re #8 Notice of Appearance, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/31/2018. (km)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J Farley on behalf of Israel Z Rodriguez, Swift Leasing Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC (Farley, Donald)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 Swift's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc. by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(Orler, Mark)
October 16, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (km)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc., Samuel Tobias re #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/17/2018. (km)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Quemetco, Inc.. (Anderson, Tyler)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Quemetco West, LLC. (Anderson, Tyler)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Anderson on behalf of Quemetco West, LLC, Quemetco, Inc. (Anderson, Tyler)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Swift of AZ, #2 Summons Swift Transportation, #3 Summons Swift Leasing, #4 Summons Quemetco Inc., #5 Summons Quemetco West)(hs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1792246.), filed by Samuel Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rodriguez, #2 Summons Swift of AZ, #3 Summons Swift, #4 Summons Swift Leasing, #5 Summons Quemetco, Inc., #6 Summons Quemetco West, #7 Cover Sheet)(Dinius, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quemetco West, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quemetco, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Leasing Co., LLC
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Z Rodriguez
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Tobias
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Dinius
Represented By: Sarah Louise Hallock-Jayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?