Card v. The Herjavec Group Corp
Plaintiff: Robin Card
Defendant: The Herjavec Group Corp
Case Number: 1:2018cv00419
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ADR must be held by 8/30/2019. As previously ordered, all matters are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2019.). Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by The Herjavec Group Corp . (Ashby, D.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by The Herjavec Group Corp. (Ashby, D.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 11/21/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (so)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Herjavec Group Corp. (Ashby, D.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by The Herjavec Group Corp.(Ashby, D.)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (st)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Robin Card and The Herjavec Group Corp re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/4/2018. (st)
October 1, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - The Herjavec Group Corp served on 10/1/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Herjavec Group Corp from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-18-15805.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1792823.), filed by The Herjavec Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet)(Ashby, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Card v. The Herjavec Group Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Herjavec Group Corp
Represented By: William Keith Smith
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Card
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?