Von Puckett v. Bartlett et al

Petitioner: Jeremy Von Puckett
Respondent: Butch Otter, Sandy Jones, Steve Bartlett and Patrick Lorenzo
Case Number: 1:2018cv00432
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
0 Judge: Candy W Dale
1 Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-00432-DCN. (cjs)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner must file an amended petition as set forth above. If Petitioner does not do so, or if the amended petition does not remedy the deficiencies explained in this Order, this entire action may be dismissed without further notice. Alternatively, Petitioner may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a courtesy copy of this Order to Mark J. Ackley, Petitioner counsel of record in United States v. Von Puckett, Case No. 1:18-cr-00250-EJL. 3. Because not all named parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73, this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Steve Bartlett, Sandy Jones, Patrick Lorenzo, Butch Otter, and to Jeremy Von Puckett Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/10/2018. (cjs)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
October 9, 2018 RECEIPT: Habeas Corpus Filing Fee Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt # IDX100023052 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremy Von Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Puckett v. Bartlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Von Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Butch Otter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?