DeKlotz et al v. Sanofi-Aventis et al
Plaintiff: Elise DeKlotz, Analena DeKlotz, Sophia DeKlotz, the Estate of Wesley DeKlotz, a deceased person, T.D., a minor child, Estate of Wesley DeKlotz, The and T.D.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC and John & Jane Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2018cv00433
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Deadlines and Telephonic Scheduling Comference Christopher C. Burke appearing for Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Motions referred to Candy W. Dale. Responses due by 12/25/2018 (Burke, Christopher)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elise DeKlotz. Replies due by 12/14/2018.(Monteleone, Jason)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney William F Northrip for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 7, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (cjs)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER ADOPTING [Dkt. 12] Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines for Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 5]. Plaintiffs' response is due on November 20, 2018 and Defendant's reply is due on December 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Extend Deadlines by Elise DeKlotz. (Monteleone, Jason)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher P. Graham. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1807435.)Christopher P Graham appearing for Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC.Motions referred to Candy W. Dale. Responses due by 11/26/2018 (Graham, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 12/12/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED All non-dispositive matters are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale. Judge Dale is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. If the matter is a non-dispositive motion, Judge Dale is directed to enter an appropriate order as to disposition. A party contending the order is clearly erroneous or contrary to law shall file written objections with the court within fourteen (14) days. 28 U.S.C 636(b)(1)(A); Local Rule 72.1. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (so).
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Burke, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Burke, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC.. (Fuhrman, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim William A Fuhrman appearing for Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Fuhrman, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Analena DeKlotz, Elise DeKlotz, Sophia DeKlotz, Estate of Wesley DeKlotz, The, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC, T.D., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/14/2018. (cjs)
October 15, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 10/9/2018; Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC served on 10/9/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 10/9/2018. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Burke, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. from Blaine County District Court, case number CV07-18-00133.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1795959.), filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit A - Summons, #5 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service for Teva, #6 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit A - Another Summons, #8 Exhibit B - Mylan Consent, #9 Exhibit C - Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Consent)(Burke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeKlotz et al v. Sanofi-Aventis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: John J Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Graham
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Represented By: William F Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise DeKlotz
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analena DeKlotz
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia DeKlotz
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: the Estate of Wesley DeKlotz, a deceased person
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.D., a minor child
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Wesley DeKlotz, The
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.D.
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?