Stirling et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Stirling and Brandon Stirling
Defendant: Lannett Company, Inc, Genus Lifesciences Inc, Alcami Carolinas Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Impax Laboratories, Inc, M.D. Glen Lovelace, St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd. and Valley Technologies
Case Number: 1:2018cv00436
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 21:331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 49 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
November 30, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court Joinder filed by St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd.. Replies due by 12/14/2018.(Jones, Terrence)
November 30, 2018 Filing 47 JOINDER by Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc joining #44 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #30 . (Kraft, Steven)
November 29, 2018 Filing 46 JOINDER by Defendant Glen Lovelace joining #44 Response to Motion, #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Rauer, Portia)
November 29, 2018 Filing 45 JOINDER by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation joining #44 Response to Motion to Remand #30 . (Burke, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT GENUS LIFESCIENCES INC. TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by Genus Lifesciences Inc. Replies due by 12/13/2018.(Rosholt, Andrea)
November 19, 2018 Filing 43 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #36 Response(generic) filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation. (Richardson, Bradley)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion to Continue (Dkt. #31 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs responses to the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories, LLC will not be due until 21 days after entry of the Courts order on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by Glen Lovelace re #28 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Non-Opposition (Rauer, Portia)
November 14, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Continue the Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories LLC filed by St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd.. Replies due by 11/28/2018.(Jones, Terrence)
November 14, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Bradley S. Richardson re #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation Exhibit 1 (Part 3 and 4). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richardson, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION re #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation Exhibit 1 (Part 1 and 2). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richardson, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Bradley S. Richardson filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Richardson, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Richardson, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Continue the Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories LLC filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Replies due by 11/28/2018.(Burke, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Continue the Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories LLC filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. Replies due by 11/27/2018.(Kraft, Steven)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Due to the time sensitive nature of Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue the Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. #31 ), any opposition to the Motion to Continue must be filed by Defendants no later than 5:00 PM on Wednesday, November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jr).
November 8, 2018 Filing 32 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Matt Malinowski and #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Tabitha M. King for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
November 8, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Continue the Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories LLC Steven B Andersen appearing for Plaintiff Brandon Stirling. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Briefing and Hearings on the Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Impax Laboratories, LLC)(Andersen, Steven)
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court Steven B Andersen appearing for Plaintiff Brandon Stirling. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)(Andersen, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint; Demand for Trial By Jury by Genus Lifesciences Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas, Stephen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Steven R Kraft appearing for Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kraft, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brandon Stirling, Michelle Stirling (Andersen, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate St. Luke's Health System, LTD. for St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd... (Jones, Terrence)
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd..(Jones, Terrence)
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury by Genus Lifesciences Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas, Stephen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Tabitha M. King. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1805555.)John J Burke appearing for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Burke, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Malinowski. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1805552.)John J Burke appearing for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Burke, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Alcami Carolinas Corporation, Glen Lovelace, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #6 Answer to Complaint, #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/31/2018. (km)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Burke, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim John J Burke appearing for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Burke, John)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lannett Company, Inc. (Wetherell, Robert)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Impax Laboratories, Inc. (Kraft, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alcami Carolinas Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Alcami Corporation for Alcami Carolinas Corporation.. (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alcami Carolinas Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Alcami Corporation for Alcami Carolinas Corporation.. (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Kenneth Morgan re #12 Declaration, #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #11 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Mallory Haddon re #12 Declaration, #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #11 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh F Part 2 to Dec of Mallory Haddon, #2 Exhibit Exh G to Dec of Mallory Haddon)(Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mallory Haddon re #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #11 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh F Part 1 to Dec of Mallory Haddon)(Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Mallory Haddon re #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh C to Dec of Mallory Haddon, #2 Exhibit Exh D to Dec of Mallory Haddon, #3 Exhibit Exh E to Dec of Mallory Haddon)(Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Mallory Haddon re #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #9 Declaration, #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Dec of Mallory Haddon, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Dec of Mallory Haddon)(Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #8 Memorandum/Brief (generic), #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Alcami Carolinas Corporation . (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted Bradley S Richardson appearing for Defendant Alcami Carolinas Corporation. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Richardson, Bradley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Glen Lovelace.(Rauer, Portia)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas Cullen for Impax Laboratories, Inc Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas Cullen. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1799083.)Steven R Kraft appearing for Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Kraft, Steven)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genus Lifesciences Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (km)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Genus Lifesciences Inc, Brandon Stirling, and Michelle Stirling re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/14/2018. (km)
October 15, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (km)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genus Lifesciences Inc from Idaho Fourth Judicial District Ada County, case number cv01-18-04880.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1796125.), filed by Genus Lifesciences Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A FDA 2.17.11 Response, #3 Exhibit A-1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit A-2 Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-3 Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-4 Summons, #7 Exhibit A-5 Affidavits of Service, #8 Exhibit A-6 Consents of Removal)(Thomas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stirling et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Stirling
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Stirling
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannett Company, Inc
Represented By: Robert T Wetherell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genus Lifesciences Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Represented By: Peter Eugene Thomas
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcami Carolinas Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Jo Garrett
Represented By: Michael Anthony Pope
Represented By: Bradley S Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Tabitha M. King
Represented By: John J Burke
Represented By: Matt Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc
Represented By: Steven R Kraft
Represented By: Thomas Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Glen Lovelace
Represented By: Portia L Rauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd.
Represented By: Terrence Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?