Jackson Jet Center, LLC v. Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jackson Jet Center, LLC
Defendant: TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC and Van Rooyen Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00440
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Idaho District Court
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2018 15 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/18/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill, to discuss the status of the Parties' settlement agreement. Plaintiff is directed to initiate the conference call. The Court can be reached at 208-334-9145. (jlb)
November 19, 2018 14 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: Due to the pending settlement of this case, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2018 is VACATED. (jlb)
November 13, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Parties report that a settlement has been reached in this case. As such, all deadlines in this case are STAYED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kc)
November 12, 2018 12 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Christopher D Bryan appearing for Defendants TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Bryan, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Responsive Pleading. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants deadline to file a responsive pleading in the above captioned matter shall be November 15, 2018. (TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust; Van Rooyen Group, LLC; Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC answers due 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 6, 2018 10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Christopher D Bryan appearing for Defendants TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Responses due by 11/27/2018 (Bryan, Christopher)
October 30, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants deadline to file a responsive pleading in the above captioned matter shall be November 8, 2018. (TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust; Van Rooyen Group, LLC; Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC answer due 11/8/2018.) Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 29, 2018 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Christopher D Bryan appearing for Defendants TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Bryan, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Order (dkt 7) Responsive pleading due by 11/1/18(jp)
October 18, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading shall be 11/1/18. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 17, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trudy Hanson Fouser appearing for Defendants TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2018 (Fouser, Trudy)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (st)
October 15, 2018 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher D Bryan for TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, and Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 15, 2018 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jackson Jet Center, LLC, TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, and Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/14/2018. (st)
October 12, 2018 3 Featured Case LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 11/12/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 03:30 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 11, 2018 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher D. Bryan. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1797283.)Trudy Hanson Fouser appearing for Defendants TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC, Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Fouser, Trudy)
October 10, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust, Van Rooyen Group, LLC and Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC served on 10/10/2018. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (st)
October 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Ada County, case number CV01-18-17567.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1796622.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fouser, Trudy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Jet Center, LLC v. Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Jet Center, LLC
Represented By: Tonn Kimball Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVPX 2017-1132 Business Trust
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Christopher D Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Romeo Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Christopher D Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Rooyen Group, LLC
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Christopher D Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?