Zoubi v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Zoubi
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00461
Filed: October 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Amanda Zoubi re #7 Response to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ballard, Ryan)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. To further the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this matter, the 12/21/2018 telephonic scheduling conference is VACATED. ADR must be held by 1/1/2020. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2019. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2020.). Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Mau, Jason)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC . (Mau, Jason)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amanda Zoubi. Replies due by 12/19/2018.(Ballard, Ryan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Funding, LLC. (Mau, Jason)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Captial Group, Inc. (ECPG) for Midland Credit Management, Inc... (Mau, Jason)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Jason R Mau appearing for Defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jon Bonnesen, #3 Exhibit A part 1 of 4, #4 Exhibit A part 2 of 4, #5 Exhibit A part 3 of 4, #6 Exhibit A part 4 of 4)(Mau, Jason)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 12/12/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Midland Funding, LLC)(cjs)
October 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1801372.), filed by Amanda Zoubi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoubi v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Zoubi
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jason R Mau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R Mau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?