Rhino Metals, Inc. v. Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rhino Metals, Inc.
Defendant: Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00474
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines Pending Resolution of Rhino Metals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer in the Eastern District of California (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court orders that this case be stayed until January 8, 2019. The parties file a joint status report with the Court no later than January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (km)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.. (Carter, Preston)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc..(Carter, Preston)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rhino Metals, Inc.. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Teague Donahey, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Donahey, Teague)
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Responses due by 11/26/2018. Replies due by 11/28/2018. By Order Dkt. 9.(cjs)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting in part #8 Motion to Shorten Time to Consider Motion to Extend Deadlines. (Dkt. 8.) For good cause shown, the briefing on Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer in the Eastern District of California ("Motion to Extend Deadlines")(Dkt. 7) is hereby shortened as follows: Plaintiff's response is due on or before November 26, 2018 and Defendant's reply, if any, is due on or before November 28, 2018. Further, the time set for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended while the Motion to Extend Deadlines (Dkt. 7) is pending. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kld)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Time to Consider Motion to Extend Deadlines Preston N Carter appearing for Defendant Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2018 (Carter, Preston)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Preston N Carter appearing for Defendant Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines, #2 Declaration of Preston Carter in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Preston Carter, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Preston Carter, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Preston Carter)(Carter, Preston)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhino Metals, Inc.. Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Donahey, Teague)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 12/19/2018, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2018 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action. (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 complaint) (st)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhino Metals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rhino Metals, Inc. for Rhino Metals, Inc... (Donahey, Teague)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1803994.), filed by Rhino Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Donahey, Teague)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhino Metals, Inc. v. Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturdy Gun Safe, Inc.
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhino Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Teague Ian Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?