Riggs et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance

Plaintiff: Colleen Riggs and Duane Riggs
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance
Case Number: 1:2018cv00494
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Auto-Owners Insurance.(Wright, Tracy)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance. (Wright, Tracy)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Auto-Owners Insurance, Colleen Riggs, Duane Riggs re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Errata Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/6/2019. (cjs)
November 7, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
November 7, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 Errata filed by Auto-Owners Insurance was filed incorrectly in this case. If all that was missing were the state court attachments and no correction was made to the main document (Notice of Removal) then the correct event to use is "Supplement" located under Other Documents. Also in future, the state court documents should be separate attachments and not combined as one.NO ACTION is needed by the filing party at this time. (cjs)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Tracy L Wright filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company in Support of #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wright, Tracy) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit text and create link (cjs).
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy L Wright on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Wright, Tracy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #2 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Wright, Tracy) Modified on 11/7/2018 to create link (cjs).
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 ERRATA by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Errata Incudes Exhibit A)(Wright, Tracy) Modified on 11/7/2018 to create link (cjs).
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-18-08358.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1808234.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Wright, Tracy) Modified on 11/7/2018 to refer to Dkt. #2 -1 for State Court Documents (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Riggs
Represented By: William G Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Riggs
Represented By: William G Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?