Gelon v. Haugh

Plaintiff: Steven Gelon
Defendant: Christie Anne Haugh
Case Number: 1:2018cv00497
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Steven Gelon Joint Discovery Plan. (Fuhrman, William)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Steven Gelon. (Fuhrman, William)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Due to reassignment, the 1/8/19 TSC before Judge Winmill is Vacated. This TSC is reset and counsel shall file their Lit/Discovery Plans no later than 1/4/19 (the due date was for today) per DOC. 5. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 09:30 AM (MTN.) in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Mr. Fuhrman shall initiate the Conference Call connecting Judge Bush at 208-334-1495.(lc)
January 3, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:18-cv-497-REB (alw)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Steven Gelon, Christie Anne Haugh re #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/2/2019. (jp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 1/3/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Gelon. Christie Anne Haugh served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Fuhrman, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christie Anne Haugh.(Meservy, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christie Anne Haugh. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Breach of Warranty Deed and Specific Performance against Christie Anne Haugh ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1808811.), filed by Steven Gelon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet)(Fuhrman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelon v. Haugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Anne Haugh
Represented By: James C. Meservy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gelon
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Represented By: Erika Parsons Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?