Corrigan et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, K. John Corrigan, Hanley Ranch Partnership and Michael F Hanley, IV
Defendant: Director of the BLM Brian Steed, Secretary of USDI Ryan K Zinke, ID State Dir BLM Peter Ditton, Boise Dist Mgr BLM Vicki Wood, Owyhee FO BLM Steve Leonard, Vicki Wood, Ryan K Zinke, Steve Leonard, Brian Steed and Peter Ditton
Case Number: 1:2018cv00512
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. This case is hereby stayed in accordance with General Order No. 339. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (km)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, - Motion to File an Amended Complaint for Judicial Review of Agency Decision W. Alan Schroeder appearing for Plaintiffs K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, Michael F Hanley, IV, Hanley Ranch Partnership. Responses due by 1/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint for Judicial Review - with track changes)(Schroeder, W.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanley Ranch Partnership, K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, Michael F Hanley, IV. All Defendants. (Schroeder, W.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Peter Ditton, Steve Leonard, Brian Steed, Vicki Wood, Ryan K Zinke, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Brian Steed, #2 Summons Issued - Peter Ditton, #3 Summons Issued - Vicki Wood, #4 Summons Issued - Steve Leonard, #5 Summons Issued - USAO, #6 Summons Issued - Attorney General)(cjs)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1813421.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Zinke, #3 Summons Steed, #4 Summons Ditton, #5 Summons Wood, #6 Summons Leonard, #7 Summons ID Civil Process Clerk, #8 Summons Attorney General)(Schroeder, W.) Modified on 11/30/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrigan et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Martha Corrigan
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Hanley
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. John Corrigan
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanley Ranch Partnership
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F Hanley, IV
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the BLM Brian Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of USDI Ryan K Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID State Dir BLM Peter Ditton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Dist Mgr BLM Vicki Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owyhee FO BLM Steve Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan K Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ditton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?