Pasco Farming, Inc. v. Ryan Hinton, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pasco Farming, Inc.
Defendant: Ryan Hinton, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00521
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before 3/4/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pasco Farming, Inc.. (Bolinger, Dane)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryan Hinton, Inc.. (Melton, Kirk)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Pasco Farming, Inc., Ryan Hinton, Inc. re #3 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/11/2019. (alw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan Hinton, Inc..(Melton, Kirk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pasco Farming, Inc.. Ryan Hinton, Inc. served on 11/23/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Bolinger, Dane)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Hinton, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1814113.), filed by Pasco Farming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Bolinger, Dane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasco Farming, Inc. v. Ryan Hinton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hinton, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Jeffrey Rands
Represented By: Kirk A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasco Farming, Inc.
Represented By: Dane Andrew Bolinger
Represented By: William Keith Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?