Huhtamaki, Inc. v. Blue Apple Marketing, LLC

Plaintiff: Huhtamaki, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Apple Marketing, LLC d/b/a Blue Apple Environmental Solutions, LLC and Blue Apple Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00531
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/1/2019 and the deadlines set in the Litigation Order (docket #5) are VACATED. The parties are to file a second status report by 2/1/2019. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 1/23/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action. (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 complaint) (st)
November 28, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #2 Notice filed by Huhtamaki, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. For future reference, this document is docketed by the Clerk's Office. No further action required. (st)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Apple Marketing, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Huhtamaki, Inc. -- Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark -- (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity against Blue Apple Marketing, LLC d/b/a Blue Apple Environmental Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1816339.), filed by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huhtamaki, Inc. v. Blue Apple Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huhtamaki, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Apple Marketing, LLC d/b/a Blue Apple Environmental Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Apple Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?