Jackson v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Jan-Patrice Jackson
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00537
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amendment of Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. ADR must be held by 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Jan-Patrice Jackson. (Hepworth, J.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY PLAN by Jan-Patrice Jackson . (Hepworth, J.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before1/15/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (McFeeley, Neil)
December 10, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation was filed incorrectly in this case. The Notice of Removal is for a different plaintiff. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing for the correct plaintiff as a Supplement.(alw)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (McFeeley, Neil)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (McFeeley, Neil)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Twin Falls County - Fifth Judicial District, case number CV42-18-2733.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1820006.), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(McFeeley, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Neil D McFeeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan-Patrice Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hepworth
Represented By: J. Grady Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?