Nutting v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tamma Nutting
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00542
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Confirmation of receipt of case transfer received from Southern District of New York 1/24/2019 - Case No. 1:19-cv-00699. (cjs)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of Court of electronic case transfer to the Southern District of New York re #6 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel (cjs)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Southern District of New York by CTO-10 re MDL No. 2859. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - CTO-10 by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No. 2859 (Attachments: #1 Text Only Entry Minute Order)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamma Nutting. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Lutz, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamma Nutting. Zimmer, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Lutz, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Zimmer Holdings Summons) (km)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1820602.), filed by Tamma Nutting. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Zimmer, Inc., #3 Summons Zimmer Holdings, Inc.)(Lutz, Michael) Modified on 12/7/2018 to correct docket text (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutting v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamma Nutting
Represented By: Michael Finton Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?