Eta Compute, Inc. v. Semones et al

Plaintiff: Eta Compute, Inc.
Defendant: Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, Susan Desko, P.C. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2018cv00552
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING OSC HEARING - IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The OSC hearing scheduled for January 30, 2019 is VACATED. (2) The OSC hearing shall instead be conducted on February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. (3) Before the hearing, plaintiff shall advise the Court as to whether the bankruptcy court has certified that conducting the OSC hearing will not result in a violation of the automatic stay. (4) Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc. is ordered to use its best efforts to notify third parties AAP Holdings, LLC and Andrew Pitt of this Order before the January 30, 2019 hearing, and, in any event, Plaintiff shall personally serve AAP and Pitt with a copy of this Order within seven (7) days of this Order. (5) All other provisions set forth in the Courts January 18, 2019 Order (Dkt. #39 ) remain in effect. (Show Cause Hearing set for 2/14/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill.)Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 25, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment, #35 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint, #37 MOTION to Expedite - Motion To Modify Order (Docket 26) and Set An Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing re #26 Memorandum Decision,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Eta Compute, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of EMagarian, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Declaration of EMagarian)(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 24, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING Upon the Record as to Defendants Timothy D. Simones and Susan Desko by Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C. (Kurtz, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eta Compute, Inc. re #39 Memorandum Decision,,, Terminate Motions,, Proof of Service-Andrew Pitt (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service-AAP Holdings, Ltd.)(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 22, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint, #36 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment, filed by Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C. Replies due by 2/5/2019.(cjs)(Submitted to the Court/Clerk for assistance filing 1/22/2019 due to prior "ex parte" restriction on motions.)
January 22, 2019 DISREGARD - filed by Inphi Partners, LLC, Susan Desko, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C..(Kurtz, Timothy) Modified on 1/23/2019 to reflect this is an erroneous entry with document filed (cjs).
January 22, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Expedite - Motion To Modify Order (Docket 26) and Set An Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing re #26 Memorandum Decision,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C.. Replies due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy R Kurtz, #2 Affidavit of Susan Desko, #3 Affidavit of Timothy D Semones)(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 18, 2019 Set Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 1/30/2019 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. By Order Dkt. #39 .(cjs)
January 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #35 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/23/2019. Replies due by 1/25/2019. By Order Dkt. #39 .(cjs)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The Court will REFRAIN FROM RULING on the Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. #35 ). Defendants shall file a response to this application by no later than Wednesday, January 23, 2019. The optional reply brief shall be due January 25, 2019. (2) Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Writ of Attachment (Dkt. 36) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part... Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The following expedited briefing schedule shall apply to Plaintiffs Motion to Modify Order and Set Expedited Hearing (Dkt. 37): Defendants shall file a written response to the motion on or before January 22, 2019. The optional reply brief shall be due by January 24, 2019. After reviewing the briefing, Court will determine if a hearing is necessary. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill (mls)
January 14, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Expedite - Motion To Modify Order (Docket 26) and Set An Expedited Hearing, MOTION for Hearing re #26 Memorandum Decision,,, Terminate Motions,, ( Responses due by 2/4/2019)Scott D Goldsmith appearing for Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward Magarian In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Order (Docket 26) and Set An Expedited Hearing, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Magarian Declaration)(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment Scott D Goldsmith appearing for Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc.. Responses due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support -Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment, #2 Affidavit -Second Affidavit of Edward Magarian In Support of Application For Writ of Attachment, #3 Exhibit -Exhibits A - I to Magarian Affidavit)(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 14, 2019 Filing 35 EX PARTE MOTION -Ex Parte Application For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint Scott D Goldsmith appearing for Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc.. Responses due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Scott D. Goldsmith In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint)(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 14, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION re 12 Order on Ex Parte Motion Stipulation and Order by Eta Compute, Inc.. (Goldsmith, Scott)
January 11, 2019 Filing 33 Defendants Susan Desko and Susan Desko PC's Answer to First Amended Complaint ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Susan Desko, Susan Desko, P.C..(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 32 Defendants Timothy D. Semones and Inphi Partners LLC's Answer to First Amended Complaint ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones.(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: On January 8, 2019, the Court entered an order (Dkt. 26) requiring, among other things, that counsel report to the Court regarding either an agreed-upon undertaking amount or failing that, their respective recommendations for an additional undertaking. See Dkt. 26, at 6. The order further provided that if Defendants failed to provide Plaintiff with sufficient information to identify the amount of cash subject to the January 8, 2019 Order by January 11, 2019, the Court would set the additional undertaking at $250,000, bringing the total undertaking to $350,000. The Court hereby extends the deadlines for the parties to file either a stipulation regarding an agreed-upon undertaking amount to Monday, January 14, 2019. The $100,000 undertaking currently on file thus remains sufficient at this time. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inphi Partners, LLC. (Kurtz, Timothy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Susan Desko, P.C.. (Kurtz, Timothy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eta Compute, Inc.. (Goldsmith, Scott)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Susan Desko, Eta Compute, Inc., Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C. re #19 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/11/2019. (cjs)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Pursuant to Idaho Code 8-503(e), after considering the showing made by the parties, the Court finds there is a reasonable probability that Plaintiff will prevail in its claims. Defendants motion to vacate the writ of attachment issued on December 21, 2018 (Dkt. #20 ) is DENIED. Defendants motion to clarify or reconsider (Dkt. #23 ) is granted to the extent the Court clarifies that it did not intend to, and did not, order the prejudgment sale of the Semones vehicles.... Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Show Cause Hearing Motion For Clarification And/Or Reconsideration That Vehicles Must Not Be Sold After Attachment Because There Is No Judgment As Required Under Idaho Code 8 505 And It Is Not In The Be filed by Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/8/2019.(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Show Cause Hearing Motion For Clarification And/Or Reconsideration That Vehicles Must Not Be Sold After Attachment Because There Is No Judgment As Required Under Idaho Code 8 505 And It Is Not In The Be filed by Eta Compute, Inc.. Replies due by 1/18/2019.(Goldsmith, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Show Cause Hearing Motion For Clarification And/Or Reconsideration That Vehicles Must Not Be Sold After Attachment Because There Is No Judgment As Required Under Idaho Code 8 505 And It Is Not In The Best Interest Of Parties Timothy Ryan Kurtz appearing for Defendants Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C.. Responses due by 1/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C. re #20 MOTION to Set Aside #13 Memorandum Decision, Supplemental Affidavit of Timothy Semones With Appraisals in Support of Motion for Cause Why Writ of Attachment Should Not Be Issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C)(Kurtz, Timothy)
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/2/2019. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Set Aside #13 Memorandum Decision, Timothy Ryan Kurtz appearing for Defendants Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C.. Responses due by 1/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Kurtz, Timothy)
December 31, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ryan Kurtz on behalf of Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C. (Kurtz, Timothy)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eta Compute, Inc. Proof of Service-Defendant Timothy D. Semones (First Amended Complaint; Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment; Writ of Attachment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Writ of Attachment; Memorandum of Decision and Order; Order; Affidavit of Gopal Raghavan In Support of Application For Writ of Attachment with Exhibits A-B; Affidavit of Michael Dudley In Support of Application For Writ of Attachment with Exhibits A-B; Affidavid Edward B. Magarian In Support of Application For Writ of Attachment with Exhibit A (Goldsmith, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: Pursuant to Order 12 and Memorandum Decision and Order #13 , a Show Cause Hearing is set for 1/2/2019 at 1:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jlb)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eta Compute, Inc. re #6 Amended Complaint -Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint-Timothy D. Semones (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint-Susan Desko, #2 Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint-Inphi Partners, LLC, #3 Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint-Susan Desko, P.C.)(Keyes, J)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 WRIT of Attachment issued. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (cjs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Eta Compute, Inc. of posting of Undertaking for Writ of Attachment Bond in the amount of $100,000 (Goldsmith, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 7 EX PARTE MOTION /Application for Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Edward B Magarian for Eta Compute, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott D Goldsmith for Eta Compute, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 ERRATA by Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc. re 7 EX PARTE MOTION /Application for Writ of Attachment . (Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 EX PARTE MOTION /Application for Writ of Attachment filed by Eta Compute, Inc..(Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Eta Compute, Inc..(Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Edward B. Magarian. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1822822.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott D. Goldsmith. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1822800.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Plaintiff Eta Compute, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Susan Desko, Inphi Partners, LLC, Timothy D. Semones, Susan Desko, P.C.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Susan Desko, #2 Summons Issued - Inphi Partners, LLC, #3 Summons Issued - Susan Desko, P.C.)(cjs)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eta Compute, Inc.. (Keyes, J)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1822563.), filed by Eta Compute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Timothy D. Semones, #2 Summons to Susan Desko, #3 Summons to Inphi Partners, LLC, #4 Summons to Susan Desko, P.C., #5 Cover Sheet)(Keyes, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eta Compute, Inc. v. Semones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inphi Partners, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Semones
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Desko
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Desko, P.C.
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eta Compute, Inc.
Represented By: J Michael Keyes
Represented By: Scott D Goldsmith
Represented By: Edward B Magarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?