Lietz v. Wilkie et al

Plaintiff: Paul Lietz
Defendant: Michael J Murphy, Robert Wilkie, John and Jane Doe 1-25, Andrew Wilpher, David A Wood, Lawrence Carroll and Keri Barbero
Case Number: 1:2018cv00554
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Regarding the Notice to the Court of Compliance With Litigation Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference by Paul Lietz re #3 Litigation Order, (cjs)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Regarding The Litigation Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference by Paul Lietz. (cjs)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Lietz re #3 Litigation Order, (cjs)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Regarding the Notice and Waiver of Law Suit of Summons by Paul Lietz (Attachments: #1 Amended Certificate of Service Re the Notice and Waiver of Law Suit & Complaint)(cjs)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 3/6/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (alw)
December 13, 2018 RECEIPT: filing fee Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 23426 (alw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Paul Lietz. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lietz v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wilpher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?