Roskelley v. Collection Bureau, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keith Roskelley
Defendant: Mark L. Clark, PLLC, Collection Bureau, Inc. and Mark L Clark
Case Number: 1:2018cv00561
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Blythe H Chandler for Keith Roskelley; approving #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Beth E Terrell for Keith Roskelley. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Keith Roskelley. Responses due by 3/5/2019 (Ballard, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Beth Terrell. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1846277.)Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Keith Roskelley. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Ballard, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Blythe Chandler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1846276.)Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Keith Roskelley. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Ballard, Ryan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/28/2019 11:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 3/5/2019 11:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 2/26/2019. (at)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark L. Clark, PLLC. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Collection Bureau, Inc.. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mark L Clark, Collection Bureau, Inc., Mark L. Clark, PLLC.(Hasson, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Mark L Clark, Collection Bureau, Inc., Mark L. Clark, PLLC, Keith Roskelley re #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/12/2019. (cjs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Jeffrey I Hasson for Collection Bureau, Inc., Mark L. Clark, PLLC, Mark L Clark. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Mayes Fawcett on behalf of All Defendants (Fawcett, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I. Hasson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1829520.)Jeffrey I Hasson appearing for Defendants Mark L Clark, Collection Bureau, Inc., Mark L. Clark, PLLC. Responses due by 1/23/2019 (Hasson, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 2/21/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons issued Collection Bureau, Inc., #2 Summons issued Mark L Clark PLLC)(alw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1826539.), filed by Keith Roskelley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roskelley v. Collection Bureau, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Clark, PLLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Ryan Mayes Fawcett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Ryan Mayes Fawcett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L Clark
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Ryan Mayes Fawcett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Roskelley
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?