Behrens v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.

Plaintiff: Crystal Behrens
Defendant: Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00563
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Joshua R. Trigsted for Crystal Behrens. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Joshua Randall Trigsted. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1847051.)Paul Thomas Clark appearing for Plaintiff Crystal Behrens. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Clark, Paul)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Clark on behalf of Crystal Behrens (Clark, Paul)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Jeffrey I Hasson terminated. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.. (Lico, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc..(Lico, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 2/13/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Crystal Behrens, Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/19/2019. (cjs)
December 21, 2018 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants.1. (cjs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:18-cv-01875. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue #5 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is transferred to the District of Idaho. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion to Change or Transfer Venue to District of Idaho. Filed by Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey I. Hasson appearing on behalf of Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/25/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5609063 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Crystal Behrens against Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Trigsted, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behrens v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Joseph Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Behrens
Represented By: Joshua R. Trigsted
Represented By: Paul Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?