Isaac v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Dustin R Isaac
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00566
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by Dustin R Isaac. (Comstock, David)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on March 28, 2019, at 11:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before March 21, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1827662.), filed by Dustin R Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Comstock, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin R Isaac
Represented By: David E Comstock
Represented By: John A Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?