Pleasant v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Plaintiff: Pleasant Elliot and Elliot Pleasant
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00570
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry dkt 5 was inadvertently filed with the incorrect docket event. The clerk will unseal dkt 5 & regenerate the NEF.(jp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Settlement by Elliot Pleasant. (Geile, Patrick) Modified on 1/31/2019 to unseal and correct the title. (jp).
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by National Credit Adjusters, LLC of Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline (Fuller, Lyle)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elliot Pleasant. National Credit Adjusters, LLC served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Geile, Patrick)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pleasant Elliot ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1827975.), filed by Pleasant Elliot. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Geile, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleasant v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pleasant Elliot
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Pleasant
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?