Transue v. Idaho Attorney General
Petitioner: Bryce C Transue
Respondent: Idaho Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00008
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Bryce Transue re: #9 Order. (Dkt 9 re-mailed to Mr. Transue's new address)(jp)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bryce C Transue (jp)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by L LaMont Anderson on behalf of Idaho Attorney General (Anderson, L)
February 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Idaho Attorney General answer due 6/25/2019. Per dkt 9, Within 120 days after service of the Petition, Respondent may file either of the following: (1) a motion for summary dismissal or partial summary dismissal on procedural grounds ; or (2) an answer and brief. (jp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee when Petitioner next receives funds in Petitioner's prison trust account. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Dkt 3 and this order emailed to Lamont Anderson-jp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Attorney General, Bryce C Transue re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/19/2019. (jp) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/18/2019) (jp).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/18/2019) (jp).
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Bryce C Transue. Responses due by 2/4/2019 (jp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bryce C Transue.(jp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryce C Transue. (jp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Bryce C Transue. Responses due by 2/4/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transue v. Idaho Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryce C Transue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Idaho Attorney General
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?