Twin Falls NSC, LLC v. Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Twin Falls NSC, LLC
Defendant: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 A REQUEST TO REMAIN WITH A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(cjs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twin Falls NSC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmSurg Holdings, Inc. for Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC.. (Hess, Scott)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/6/2019. (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Counter Defendant Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Hess, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Confirm Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Hess, Scott)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award filed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Replies due by 3/7/2019.(Hess, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC re #8 Counterclaim, Notice of Lodging of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 43)(Rosa, Angelo)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award Angelo Luigi Rosa appearing for Defendant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Counter Claimant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rosa, Angelo)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award against Twin Falls NSC, LLC, filed by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Rosa, Angelo) Modified on 2/12/2019 to reflect Sealed Exhibits 9, 16, 20, 23, 24 & 31 on Disk lodged and placed in Clerk's Office file room (cjs).
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 , #4 , & #5 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys W Brantley Phillips, Jr., Russell S Baldwin, & Allison Wiseman Acker for Twin Falls NSC LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Hess, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839588.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Russell S. Baldwin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839580.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Allison Wiseman Acker. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839563.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award against Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1832121.), filed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hess, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin Falls NSC, LLC v. Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Angelo Luigi Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Falls NSC, LLC
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Scott D Hess
Represented By: Russell S Baldwin
Represented By: Allison Wiseman Acker
Represented By: W Brantley Phillips, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?