United State of America v. U.S. Currency in the Approximate Sum of $19,809.49 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accounts

Plaintiff: United State of America
Defendant: U.S. Currency in the Approximate Sum of $19,809.49 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accounts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United State of America. Last publication date February 18, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Maloney, Kevin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Application for Warrant of Arrest In Rem Kevin T Maloney appearing for Plaintiff United State of America. Responses due by 2/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Maloney, Kevin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Sealed Document Re: #1 Complaint Exhibit A Affidavit in Support of Verified Complaint In Rem. (Maloney, Kevin) Modified on 1/31/2019 to reflect under seal by Order Dkt. #3 (cjs).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SEAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION Motion to Seal Affidavit in Support of Verified Complaint in Rem Kevin T Maloney appearing for Plaintiff United State of America. Responses due by 1/31/2019 (Maloney, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint in Rem against U.S. Currency in the Approximate Sum of $19,809.49 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accounts, filed by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Maloney, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United State of America v. U.S. Currency in the Approximate Sum of $19,809.49 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: Kevin T Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Currency in the Approximate Sum of $19,809.49 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?